RONALDSON v. NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS
Plaintiff: Christina Ronaldson
Defendant: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01034
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Zia M Faruqui
Referring Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
2 Judge: Deborah A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's #137 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Angela K. St. Pierre. Counsel St. Pierre represents that they practice from an office located in the District of Columbia and they have been admitted to the Bar of the District of Columbia. Attorney Admissions has represented to Chambers that counsel St. Pierre has not yet applied for admission to the bar of this jurisdiction. As such, and pursuant to LCvR 83.2(c)(2) and the comment thereto, the #137 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Angela K. St. Pierre is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court will grant admission pro hac vice only after counsel St. Pierre submits an Application for Admission to the Bar of the United States District and Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 31, 2023. (lcckk1)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Good Standing of Angela St. Pierre, Esq. by CHRISTINA RONALDSON re #137 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Seldon, Robert)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS re #154 Reply to opposition to Motion, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Bononno, Samantha)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 REPLY to opposition to motion re #134 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Genuine Issues in Dispute, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibit 16, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibit 19)(Bononno, Samantha)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's #153 Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, filed September 20, 2022. Defendant represents that technical glitches on Plaintiff's part have limited Defendant's ability to review Plaintiff's exhibits in support of Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment. These exhibits total almost 1,000 pages. As such, Defendant requests an extension of time, from September 20, 2022 to October 7, 2022, to file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment. As Plaintiff consents, and upon good cause shown, Defendant's #153 Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its reply on or before October 7, 2022. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that, per the Court's #7 Order, all requests for extension of time must be filed at least four business days prior to the affected deadline. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 21, 2022. (lcckk1)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply to #134 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/7/2022. (dot)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply In Further Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bononno, Samantha)
September 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Seldon, Robert)
September 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Replacement of Corrupted Electronic Version by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Seldon, Robert)
September 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE Regarding Partial Summary Judgment by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Seldon, Robert)
September 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 SEALED LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. re #143 Sealed Opposition,, filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. Seldon Decl., Attachment C - NAHB doc's_Part5 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Seldon, Robert)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 SEALED LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. re #143 Sealed Opposition,, filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. Seldon Decl., Attachment C - NAHB doc's_Part4 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Seldon, Robert)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SEALED LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. re #143 Sealed Opposition,, filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. Seldon Decl., Attachment C - NAHB doc's_Part3 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Seldon, Robert)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 SEALED LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. re #143 Sealed Opposition,, filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. Seldon Decl., Attachment C - NAHB doc's_Part2 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Seldon, Robert)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 SEALED LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. Seldon Decl., Attachment C - NAHB doc's_Part1 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Seldon, Robert)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 SEALED LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. re #143 Sealed Opposition,, filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. Seldon Decl., Attachment G - Deposition Excerpts (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Seldon, Robert)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. re #142 Motion to Seal Case (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Statement of Facts Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Ronaldson Decl., #4 Affidavit Seldon Decl., #5 Exhibit Seldon Decl., Attachment A - RFP INT 10.2.2019 FINAL, #6 Exhibit Seldon Decl., Attachment B - Original Index 7.8.2020, #7 Exhibit Seldon Decl., Attachment D - Correspondence, #8 Exhibit Seldon Decl., Attachment E - Colladay Subpoena 3.282021, #9 Exhibit Seldon Decl., Attachment F - Def 2d Supp. Discl. 12.30.2020)(Seldon, Robert)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION to Seal Case Summary Judgment Opposition by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition to #134 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/2/2022. Defendant's Reply to #134 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/23/2022. (dot)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 REPLY re #139 MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Summary Judgment and Move For Partial Summary Judgment filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Seldon, Robert) Modified on 9/2/2022 to correct event(zjm).
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 RESPONSE re #139 MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Summary Judgment and Move For Partial Summary Judgment (Notice of Defendant's Position as to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Extension of Time) filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Bononno, Samantha)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendant's #140 Notice of Defendant's Position as to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Extension of Time, and upon good cause shown, Plaintiff's #139 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its opposition on or before September 2, 2022, and Defendant shall file their reply on or before September 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 1, 2022. (lcckk1)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's #139 Motion for Extension of Time. For the third time, Plaintiff requests an extension of time, now from August 30, 2022 to September 2, 2022, to file her opposition to Defendant's #134 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Motion does not indicate Defendant's position on the requested relief. As such, Defendant shall file a notice, on or before September 2, 2022, stating its position on Plaintiff's #139 Motion for Extension of Time. In the meantime, Plaintiff's #139 Motion for Extension of Time is HELD IN ABEYANCE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 1, 2022. (lcckk1)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Summary Judgment and Move For Partial Summary Judgment by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/30/2022. Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/16/2022. (dot)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's #138 Motion for a Two Business-Day Enlargement of Time. Plaintiff's counsel represents that due to staffing shortages, he requires an additional two business days to file Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for #134 Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, Plaintiff requests the Court extend the deadline for Plaintiff's opposition from August 26, 2022 to August 30, 2022. As Defendant consents, and upon good cause shown, Plaintiff's #138 Motion for a Two-Business Day Enlargement of Time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file her opposition on or before August 30, 2022, and Defendant shall file its reply on or before September 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 29, 2022. (lcckk1)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Summary Judgement -- Two Business Days by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Angela St. Pierre, Esq., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9461896. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #137 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; emailed to rcs@sba-pc.com, cc'd 26 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed, 2. Pro Hac Vice motion must be accompanied by a Certificate of Good Standing issued within the last 30 days (LCvR 83.2(c)(2)). Please file certificate as an Errata (zjm, )
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's #136 Consent Motion for Two Week Enlargement of Time of Summary Judgment Schedule. Plaintiff represents that one of her attorneys assigned to this matter has recently left Plaintiff's counsel's firm; as such, Plaintiff's counsel requires a two-week extension of time, from August 12, 2022 August 26, 2022, to file Plaintiff's partial cross-motion for summary judgment. As Defendant consents, and upon good cause shown, Plaintiff's #136 Consent Motion for Two Week Enlargement of Time of Summary Judgment Schedule is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file her partial cross-motion for summary judgment on or before August 26, 2022. Defendant shall filed their reply on or before September 16, 2022, and Plaintiff shall file her reply on or before October 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 9, 2022. (lcckk1)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Partial Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/26/2022. Defendant's Response to Partial Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/16/2022. Plaintiff's Reply to Partial Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/7/2022. (dot)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Summary Judgment Briefing by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CHRISTINA RONALDSON. Attorney Molly E. Buie terminated. (Buie, Molly)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bononno, Samantha)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion due by 6/24/2022. Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/12/2022. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/2/2022. Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/12/2022. Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/2/2022. Reply to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/23/2022. (dot)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bononno, Samantha)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's #133 Consent Motion to Amend Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule. Defendant requests a two-week extension to file its motion for summary judgment, from June 10, 2022 to June 24, 2022, due to counsel for Defendant's unexpected travel and "family health concerns." As Plaintiff consents, and upon good cause shown, Defendant's #133 Consent Motion to Amend Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. The briefing schedule set forth in the Court's #131 Order is amended as follows: Defendant's motion for summary judgment due on or before June 24, 2022; Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for partial summary judgment due on or before August 12, 2022; Defendant's reply and opposition due on or before September 2, 2022; Plaintiff's reply due September 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 8, 2022. (lcckk1)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS.(Bononno, Samantha)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Defendant's motion for summary judgment due on or before June 10, 2022; Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment due on or before July 29, 2022; Defendant's reply and opposition due on or before August 19, 2022; Plaintiff's reply due on or before September 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 2, 2022. (lcckk1)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/29/2022. Response to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/19/2022. Reply to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/2/2022. Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion due by 6/10/2022. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/29/2022. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/19/2022. (dot)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE Re: Plaintiff's Availability for Mediation by CHRISTINA RONALDSON re Status Conference,, Set Deadlines, (Seldon, Robert)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 4/27/2022. Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion due by 6/10/2022. Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/29/2022. Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/19/2022. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Saint-Loth.) (dot)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying #122 Motion to Dismiss and setting scheduling conference for April 27, 2022 at 1:00 PM ET. See Memorandum Opinion & Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 16, 2022. (lcckk1)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Hearing set for 4/27/2022 at 1:00 PM via Telephonic before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 REPLY to opposition to motion re #122 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings with respect to Count II of Plaintiffs Second Amended ComplaintMOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Bononno, Samantha)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Memorandum in opposition to re #122 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings with respect to Count II of Plaintiffs Second Amended ComplaintMOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buie, Molly)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #122 due by 8/16/2021. (dot)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #125 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 2, 2021. (lcckk1)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Second Motion to Dismiss by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert) Modified event on 8/3/2021 (ztd).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 20, 2021. (lcckk1)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #122 due by 8/5/2021. (dot)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings with respect to Count II of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bononno, Samantha). Added MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on 7/15/2021 (ztd).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or otherwise respond to Second Amended Complaint due by 7/12/2021. (dot)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 7, 2021. (lcckk1)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION for Extension of Time to RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bononno, Samantha) Modified event on 7/7/2021 (ztd).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 3, 2021. (lcckk1)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibits by CHRISTINA RONALDSON re #117 Reply to opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Att. L, #2 Exhibit Att. M, #3 Exhibit Att. N, #4 Exhibit Att. O, #5 Exhibit Att. P, #6 Exhibit Att. Q, #7 Exhibit Att. R, #8 Exhibit Att. S, #9 Exhibit Att. T, #10 Exhibit Ramage Dep. excerpt)(Seldon, Robert)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REPLY to opposition to motion re #112 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Seldon, Robert)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #115 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 31, 2021. (lcckk1)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Reply to #112 due by 4/9/2021. (dot)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #112 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buie, Molly)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Memorandum in opposition to re #112 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Bononno, Samantha)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON re #112 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Buie, Molly)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Att. J, #3 Att. K)(Buie, Molly)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS.(Bononno, Samantha)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS re #108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Bononno, Samantha)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Memorandum in opposition to re #108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Seldon, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bononno, Samantha)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON re #94 SEALED MOTION filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Corrected Seldon Decl.)(Buie, Molly)
February 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ERRATA Re: Reformatted Reply Memorandum by CHRISTINA RONALDSON re #104 Reply to opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Reply Re-Formatted, #2 Exhibit Table of Authorities)(Seldon, Robert) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (ztd).
February 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limit by CHRISTINA RONALDSON re #103 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration (Seldon, Robert)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .REPLY to opposition to motion re #94 SEALED MOTION filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Buie, Molly) Modified on 2/16/2021 (ztd).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Buie, Molly)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 3, 2021. (lcckk1)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to #94 due by 2/12/2021. (dot)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #94 SEALED MOTION filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Memorandum in opposition to re #94 SEALED MOTION filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Bononno, Samantha)
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #99 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is hereby ORDERED that NAHB's response in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration or Alternatively for Leave to File Motion to Amend Complaint may be up to 25 pages in length. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 18, 2021. (lcckk1) Modified to add "minute" on 1/19/2021 (znmw).
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Bononno, Samantha)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ERRATA OF FILING OF CORRECTED MOTION by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Attachments: #1 Joint Motion to Extend Time, #2 Proposed Order)(Bononno, Samantha) Modified text on 1/15/2021 (ztd).
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 15, 2021. (lcckk1)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Briefing Schedule by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Bononno, Samantha)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response due by 1/29/2021. Plaintiff's Reply due by 2/5/2021. (dot)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The status hearing presently scheduled for JANUARY 12, 2021 at 10:00 AM is hereby VACATED. The Court will reschedule the status hearing for a date subsequent to the Court's resolution of Plaintiff's #94 Motion to Reconsider or Alternatively For Leave to File Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 8, 2021. (lcckk1)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to #94 due by 1/19/2021. Plaintiff's Reply to #94 due by 1/26/2021. (dot)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's following motions: #93 Plaintiff's Consent Motion to File Under Seal, #94 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider or Alternatively For Leave to File Motion to Amend Complaint, and #95 Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limit. For good cause shown and in an exercise of its discretion, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #93 Consent Motion to File Under Seal and #95 Motion to Exceed Page Limit. The parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule for #94 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider or Alternatively For Leave to File Motion to Amend Complaint: Defendant shall file its opposition brief by or before JANUARY 19, 2021. Plaintiff shall submit any reply thereto by or before JANUARY 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 4, 2021. (lcckk1)
January 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 SEALED MOTION filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buie, Molly)
January 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SEALED MOTION filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Table of Authorities, #3 Seldon Declaration, #4 Ronaldson Declaration, #5 Ramage Dep and Exhs, #6 Smith Dep and Exhs, #7 Woods Dep and Exhs)(Buie, Molly)
January 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buie, Molly)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding #91 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 18, 2020. (lcckk1)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #43 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 18, 2020. (lcckk1)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Memorandum in opposition to re #43 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Seldon, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 D, #4 E, #5 F, #6 G, #7 H, #8 I, #9 J, #10 K, #11 L)(ztd)(UNSEALED PURSUANT TO ORDER #88 .)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #84 Motion to Unseal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 11/03/2020. (lcck)
October 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY to opposition to motion re #84 SEALED MOTION filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Seldon, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RESPONSE re #84 SEALED MOTION filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bononno, Samantha)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Sherwood Bononno on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Bononno, Samantha)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SEALED MOTION filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Buie, Molly)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to File Provisionally Under Seal by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Buie, Molly)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Status Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 10:00 AM via Telephonic/Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' #82 Joint Status Report Regarding an Amended Discovery Plan. Upon review of the proposed schedule therein, the Court hereby orders that all discovery, including fact discovery, expert disclosures, expert replies, and depositions of experts, shall be completed by or before DECEMBER 31, 2020. The Court VACATES the status hearing set for SEPTEMBER 21, 2020, and continues that status hearing for JANUARY 12, 2021 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 14, 2020. (lcckk1)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Amended Discovery Plan by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Farrington, Daniel)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Case directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui for discovery. Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Revised Discovery Plan due by 9/14/2020. (dot)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Farrington, Daniel)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Farrington on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Farrington, Daniel)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the Defendant's #81 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, which constitutes the parties third request for an extension of discovery deadlines. The Court notes that the parties both agree to the proposed extension. The current scheduling order, as amended, provides that discovery in this matter will close on SEPTEMBER 18, 2020. The parties have now requested an extension of all discovery deadlines until DECEMBER 7, 2020. The Court will hold this #81 Motion is abeyance at this time. The parties shall file a revised joint discovery plan, see #35 Amended Scheduling Order, for the Courts consideration, by or before SEPTEMBER 14, 2020. The Court will rule on the requested extension of discovery deadline after the submission of the parties' revised joint discovery plan. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 4, 2020. (lcckk1)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #79 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; emailed to tconnolly@fisherphillips.com, cc'd 15 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Document has been entered in error. Counsel must contact Attorney Admissions at (202) 354-3110 regarding bar status. (ztd, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Connolly, Theresa) Modified on 9/3/2020 (ztd).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SURREPLY to re #75 Reply Reply to Def. Objection filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Seldon, Robert) Modified to add link on 7/31/2020 (znmw).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received #76 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Sur-Reply. Plaintiff seeks leave to file a one-paragraph sur-reply to Defendant's #75 Reply in Support of its Objection to Magistrate Judge Robinsons Memorandum Opinion and Order of June 3, 2020. Plaintiff indicates that Defendant indicated an intent to oppose Plaintiff's #76 Motion, but as of the date of this Minute Order, Defendant has not yet filed any Opposition. "Surreplies are generally disfavored." Hall v. U.S. Dep't of Labor, No. 18-5100, 2018 WL 5919255, at *1 (Nov. 1, 2018 D.C. Cir.). Whether or not to grant leave to file a sur-reply is left to the discretion of the district court. Banner Health v. Sebelius, 905 F. Supp. 2d 174, 187 (D.D.C. 2012). A court considers "whether the movant's reply in fact raises arguments or issues for the first time, whether the nonmovant's proposed surreply would be helpful to the resolution of the pending motion, and whether the movant would be unduly prejudiced were leave to be granted." Id. Plaintiff here seeks to file a sur-reply clarifying three things as outlined in her Motion. The first two appear to speak to an issue raised in Defendant's Reply by way of Defendant's inclusion of Exhibit A to its Reply. All three appear helpful with respect to resolution of the pending objection, and considering the narrowness of the proposed sur-reply (one paragraph) and its focus on issues that Plaintiff claims were raised in the reply, the Court does not see that Defendant will be significantly prejudiced by its filing. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #76 Motion. Plaintiff shall file the one-paragraph reply on the docket on or before JULY 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 27, 2020. (lccck1)
July 26, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #77 Substitution of Counsel; emailed to tconnolly@fisherphillips.com, cc'd 15 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Consel must contact Attorney Admissions regarding membership. (ztd, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Theresa M. Connolly on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS Substituting for attorney Yoora Pak (Connolly, Theresa) Modified on 7/26/2020 (ztd).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply (one paragraph) to ECF #75 by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Seldon, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPLY re #74 Response to Document, filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Pak, Yoora)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESPONSE to #69 Def. Obj. to ECF #68 filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Att. A -- Pl. written discovery, #2 Exhibit Att. B -- Def. RFP responses, #3 Exhibit Att. C - Def. index, #4 Exhibit Att. D -- Def. Int. responses, #5 Exhibit Att. E -- Pl. RFP responses)(Seldon, Robert) Modified on 7/7/2020 (ztd).
June 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson held on 05/12/2020; Page Numbers: 1-57. Date of Issuance:06/25/2020. Court Reporter: Nancy J. Meyer, Telephone number (202) 354-3118, Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2020.(Meyer, Nancy)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE by CHRISTINA RONALDSON re #71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Buie, Molly)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #71 Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Objection to a discovery order, which is modified by Plaintiff's #72 Notice of the shortened time for obtaining a transcript. In the Motion, Plaintiff indicates that Defendant did not consent. Plaintiff's Response is due by 7/6/2020, and Defendant's Reply is due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 06/26/2020. (DM)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Objection for Production of Transcript by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert) Modified relief on 6/24/2020 (ztd).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and continuing July 24, 2020 status hearing until SEPTEMBER 21, 2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 18, 2020. (lccck1)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #69 due by 7/1/2020. Defendant's Reply to #69 due by 7/8/2020. (dot)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 9/21/2020. Status Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendant's #69 Objection to June 3, 2020 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Plaintiff shall file any response to the Objection by no later than JULY 1, 2020. Defendant shall file any reply by no later than JULY 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 18, 2020. (lccck1)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #68 Order filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B)(Pak, Yoora)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re #42 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 6/3/2020. (lcjh)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying without prejudice #48 Motion to Continue; denying #49 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 6/3/2020. (lcjh)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY to opposition to motion re #48 MOTION to Compel Answer to Amended Complaint MOTION to Continue Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss to Take Discovery MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Seldon, Robert)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SURREPLY to re #43 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Buie, Molly)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY to opposition to motion re #49 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Pak, Yoora)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Answer to Amended Complaint and for Continuance in Adjudication of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's Opposition shall now be due on or before June 2, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 5/27/2020. (lcjh)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Memorandum in opposition to re #48 MOTION to Compel Answer to Amended Complaint MOTION to Continue Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss to Take Discovery MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ztd)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #48 MOTION to Compel Answer to Amended Complaint MOTION to Continue Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss to Take Discovery MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Buie, Molly)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's #59 Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answer to Amended Complaint and for Continuance of the Adjudication of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Out of Time, the Motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendant's Opposition and accompanying exhibit attached to the Motion shall be deemed timely filed. Plaintiff's reply to Defendants Opposition shall now be due on or before May 29, 2020. All other deadlines, including the deadline for Defendant's reply to Plaintiff's #58 Opposition to Stay Discovery, remain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 5/26/2020. (lcjh)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the #59 Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answer to Amended Complaint and for Continuance of the Adjudication of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Out of Time. The Proposed Order attached to the Motion indicates that the Motion is addressed to Judge Kollar-Kotelly. However, the Motion is directly related to the Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Robinson. See #53 Order. The Court therefore views this #59 Motion in conjunction with the referred Motions. Accordingly, the Court clarifies that this Motion is also correspondingly referred to Magistrate Judge Robinson for resolution. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 26, 2020. (lccck1)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ENTERED ERROR. . . . .Memorandum in opposition to re #48 MOTION to Compel Answer to Amended Complaint MOTION to Continue Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss to Take Discovery MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pak, Yoora) Modified on 5/22/2020 (ztd).
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answer to Amended Complaint and for Continuace of the Adjudication of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Out of Time by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2020: #2 Opposition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Opposition) (ztd).
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #60 Memorandum in Opposition, was entered in error. Motion for leave to file has not been ruled on. (ztd)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received #57 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Sur-Reply, in which Plaintiff seeks leave to file a sur-reply to the reply in support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff claims that Defendant raised new arguments in its reply. The Court will GRANT this Motion insofar as it seeks leave to file a sur-reply and allow Plaintiff to file her sur-reply on the docket. However, the Court will only consider the sur-reply to the extent that it addresses arguments raised for the first time in Defendant's reply. Moreover, because Plaintiff appears to address issues in the briefing relating to multiple pending motions or disputes, the Court clarifies that in granting this Motion, which relates to the pending Motion to Dismiss that has not been referred, it does not intend to rule in any way on any motions or disputes that have been referred to Magistrate Judge Robinson. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 22, 2020. (lccck1)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Memorandum in opposition to re #49 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Seldon, Robert)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Def. Motion to Dismiss filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Seldon, Robert) Modified on 5/22/2020 (ztd).
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM re Order,,,, by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Attachments: #1 Att. A, #2 Att. B, #3 Att. C, #4 Att. D, #5 Att. E, #6 Att. F)(Buie, Molly)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the #55 Consent Motion for One Day Enlargement of Time, the motion is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff's opposition to #49 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery shall be due on or before May 21, 2020. Defendant's opposition to #48 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Answer the Amended Complaint and for a Continuance in the Adjudication of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings, to Take Discovery shall be due on or before May 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 5/19/2020. (lcjh)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Cross-Motions To Stay by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert) Modified event on 5/19/2020 (ztd).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 5/12/2020 Minute Order,,,, by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Pak, Yoora) Modified text on 5/15/2020 (ztd).
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE DIRECTLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for motions #48 and #49 for resolution. (zsb)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS in ECF NOs. #48 and #49 to Magistrate Judge Robinson for resolution. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 13, 2020. (lccck1)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #49 due by 5/20/2020. Defendant's Reply to #49 due by 5/27/2020. Defendant's Response to #48 due by 5/20/2020. Plaintiff's Reply to #48 due by 5/27/2020. (dot)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status Conference held on 5/12/2020. Status Conference Concluded. (Court Reporter Nancy Meyer.) (ztl)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: During the Status Conference conducted on May 12, 2020, Defendant, for the reasons set forth on the record, withdrew all of its objections to Plaintiff's discovery responses raised in Defendant's March 9 and March 10, 2020 letter briefs. Plaintiff sought to compel all of the discovery enumerated in Plaintiff's March 9 and March 10, 2020 letter briefs. Counsel for Defendant proffered various objections, including unspecified claims of privilege, and asked for an opportunity to provide authority for the proposition that Defendant's objections served on January 14 and January 22, 2020 should not be deemed waived. See #34 Joint Status Report at 1-2. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a Memorandum in which such authority is provided by no later than Friday, May 15, 2020. Plaintiff shall file a Response by no later than Tuesday, May 19, 2020. Neither memorandum shall exceed five pages in length. In the interim, further consideration of the remaining issues is stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 5/12/2020. (lcjh)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #52 Consent Motion for an Enlargement of Time, in which Plaintiff seeks a three-business day extension for oppositions to the recent #48 #49 Motions. Plaintiff seeks an extension in part because counsel for Plaintiff has extensive discovery to complete during this upcoming week. Plaintiff indicates that Defendant consents to the #52 Motion for an Enlargement of Time as long as Defendant also gets an extension for its opposition. Accordingly, for good cause shown and with the parties' consent, that #52 Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's opposition to #49 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery shall be due on or before MAY 20, 2020. Defendant's reply thereto shall be due on or before MAY 27, 2020. Defendant's opposition to #48 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Answer the Amended Complaint and for a Continuance in the Adjudication of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings, to Take Discovery shall be due on or before MAY 20, 2020. Plaintiff's reply thereto shall be due on or before MAY 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 12, 2020. (lccck1)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose CF #48, #49 by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the #50 , #51 Status Reports and letter briefing related to discovery disputes in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the Status Hearing scheduled for May 4, 2020 is CONTINUED to May 12, 2020 at 10 AM according to the telephonic status conference instructions previously emailed to counsel. In the interest of narrowing the parties' disputes, it is also hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall (1) continue to search for responsive documents related to Plaintiff's job performance as indicated in the #51 Status Report, and (2) produce to Plaintiff an Index for documents produced to Plaintiff on February 25, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 5/4/2020. (lcjh)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Pak, Yoora)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STATUS REPORT In Response to Minute Order of April 13, 2020 by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Seldon, Robert)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Stay Discovery by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Compel Answer to Amended Complaint, MOTION to Continue Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss to Take Discovery by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Seldon Declaration)(Buie, Molly). Added MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on 5/5/2020 (znmw).
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPLY to opposition to motion re #43 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Pak, Yoora)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON re #45 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Corrected Opposition)(Buie, Molly)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. re #43 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Ronaldson Decl., #2 Att. A, #3 Att. B, #4 Att. C, #5 Att. D, #6 Att. E, #7 Att. F, #8 Att. G, #9 Att. H, #10 Att. I, #11 Att. J, #12 Att. K, #13 Att. L)(Buie, Molly)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal and to Redact by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Buie, Molly)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' letter briefing and the #42 Order referring discovery disputes to the undersigned Magistrate Judge, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall appear for a Telephonic Status Conference on Monday, May 4, 2020, at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall also file a Joint Status Report by no later than May 1, 2020 which shall identify any discovery disputes that have been resolved or that have arisen since March 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 4/13/2020. (lcjh)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/1/2020. (lcjh)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received #43 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiff shall file any response by no later than APRIL 23, 2020. Defendant shall file any reply by no later than APRIL 30, 2020. This Minute Order does not impact the referral of discovery disputes to Magistrate Judge Robinson (see ECF No. #42 ). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 10, 2020. (lccck1)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #43 due by 4/23/2020. Defendant's Reply to #43 due by 4/30/2020. (dot)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora). Added MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on 4/10/2020 (ztd).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for discovery disputes. (zmc)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING discovery disputes to magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 2, 2020. (lccck1)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON.(Buie, Molly)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Court notes that Defendant has indicated that it has no objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file an Amended Complaint. Accordingly, Plaintiff should file his Amended Complaint that was attached as an exhibit to his Motion (redacted version) as a separate document on this Court's docket. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/26/2020. (DM)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Responses to #36 and #37 due by 3/20/2020; Plaintiff's Replies, if any, due by 3/27/2020. (dot)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 9, 2020. (lccck1)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Under Seal by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Buie, Molly)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received #38 Plaintiff's Response to Minute Order. Plaintiff explains that it reads Paragraph 9 of the Protective Order, ECF No. #29 , as allowing filing of documents under seal without an accompanying Motion. That provision reads: "This Order constitutes authorization for the parties to file documents under seal as provided for herein." The Court does not read this provision as doing away with the requirements of Local Civil Rule 5.1(h)(1), especially because it does not mention the rule or requirements. However, the Court notes that the provision may constitute part of an argument of why documents should be filed under seal or may constitute consent on the part of the parties' to such sealing. Accordingly, the Court shall retain the current briefing schedule on the Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 4, 2020. (lccck1)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Motion due by 3/6/2020. Response due by 3/20/2020. Reply due by 3/27/2020. (dot)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,, Regarding Sealed Filing filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Buie, Molly)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #36 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. A #37 sealed version of the Motion without redactions has also been filed. The Court notes that the submission of the Sealed Motion does not comport with the Local Rules. Local Civil Rule 5.1(h)(1) explains that a Sealed document "shall be accompanied by a motion to seal," as "[a]bsent statutory authority, no case or document may be sealed without an order from the Court." No such Motion to Seal accompanied the Sealed Motion. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file such a Motion by no later than MARCH 6, 2020. Defendant shall file any opposition to either motion by no later than MARCH 20, 2020. Plaintiff shall file any replies by no later than MARCH 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 2, 2020. (lccck1)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SEALED MOTION filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Seldon Declaration, #2 Att. A - Amended Complaint)(Buie, Molly)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Seldon Declaration, #2 Att. A - Amended Complaint)(Buie, Molly)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2020. Discovery due by 7/14/2020. Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 6/10/2020; Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 6/24/2020; Replies, if any, due by 7/1/2020. Status Conference set for 7/24/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 18, 2020. (lccck1)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery Schedule by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. (Buie, Molly)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #33 Consent Motion for One-Business Day Extension to File Joint Status Report. The parties requested an extension to file the status report due to technical difficulties. Although this Motion was not made at least four days prior to the deadline, with the parties' consent and for good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. The Court has also received the parties' #34 Joint Status Report. The parties first indicate that they may have a discovery dispute regarding Defendant's responses to written and e-discovery. The Court refers the parties to the Scheduling and Procedures Order, ECF No. #15 , at page 2 for the Court's procedures for such discovery disputes.The parties further outline a proposed schedule for further proceedings. The Court adopts many of these dates in the Amended Scheduling and Procedures Order that shall be posted separately. The Court highlights a few points here: Some of the dates that the parties have set are dates that the Court ordinarily does not adopt; the Court does not include those dates in the Amended Scheduling and Procedures Order. Moreover, the Court adopts the proposed deadline of FEBRUARY 28, 2020 for motions to amend the Complaint, which was the date proposed by Plaintiff. As Plaintiff notes, this provides Plaintiff four days after receiving further e-discovery responses under the parties' proposed schedule. The Court also extends the close of discovery by two weeks until JULY 14, 2020 to allow for any replies under Rule 26(a)(2)(B) & (C) and any related motions. Lastly, the Court VACATES the upcoming May 8, 2020 Status Hearing and sets a new Status Hearing for JULY 24, 2020 at 2:00 PM based on the parties proposed schedule. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 18, 2020. (lccck1)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2020. (dot)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 5, 2020. (lccck1)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File; emailed to yoora.pak@wilsonelser.com, cc'd 18 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Counsel must contact Attorney Admissions (202) 354-3110. (ztd, )
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pak, Yoora)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #30 Motion to Extend Date to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff requests an extension of the date to amend the Complaint from January 31, 2020 to March 2, 2020. Counsel for Plaintiff indicates that counsel for Defendant had not yet indicated Defendant's position on Plaintiff's request by the time of filing. Plaintiff requests this extension on the basis that discovery has not been completed on the schedule originally anticipated by the parties when agreeing upon that date. Based on the discovery that has occurred so far, Plaintiff anticipates seeking leave to amend the Complaint but needs additional time to attempt to resolve potential discovery disputes and to confer with Defendant. Plaintiff does not provide much information, however, regarding why Plaintiff anticipates amending the Complaint. Moreover, the Court does not have knowledge of Defendant's position on Plaintiff's Motion. As it stands, altering the deadline for amending the complaint to March 2, 2020 poses a substantial risk of disrupting the current April 30, 2020 deadline for the end of discovery, as well as other discovery deadlines set by the parties. Accordingly, the Court shall DENY WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Motion and shall further require the parties to meet and confer regarding an amended discovery schedule. The parties shall submit a joint status report by no later than FEBRUARY 5, 2020 proposing an amended schedule for upcoming deadlines, including for any still relevant deadlines in the #15 Scheduling and Procedures Order or originally proposed by the parties in their #17 Amended Joint Discovery Plan. If the parties cannot agree on certain deadlines, they shall briefly note their proposals and positions in the joint status report for those deadlines. In the meantime, the Court shall STAY the January 31, 2020 deadline for Plaintiff to amend the Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 29, 2020. (lccck1)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/5/2020. (kt)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Amend Complaint by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 10, 2020. (lccck1)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing Stipulated Protective Order by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Protective Order)(Buie, Molly)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Single revised redlined version of the proposed protective order due by 1/8/2020. (kt)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed #25 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order, #26 Defendant's Notice of Errata, and #27 Notice of Filing Redlined Draft Protective Order. In light of these multiple filings, some of which have comments and some of which do not, it is difficult, if not impossible, for the Court to discern which provisions are in dispute and the underlying reasons for those disputes. It is also difficult for the Court to understand what distinguishes this case to justify the parties' disputes over provisions or language commonly included in protective orders. Moreover, in light of the latest #27 Notice of Filing, it is unclear to what extent the parties have conferred regarding the protective order. Accordingly, to clarify these issues and to assist the Court in determining the final protective order, the parties shall file a single revised redlined version of the proposed protective order. This revised version shall include within the document (i.e., not in separate briefing) short explanations of the parties' dispute with respect to the provisions at issue. This may be accomplished through the Microsoft Word comment function, footnotes, or in some other way, so long as they are distinguished from the text of the proposed protective order. The parties must confer before submitting this revised version to ensure that they have narrowed the disputes they want to present to this Court. This redlined version shall be filed no later than JANUARY 8, 2020. The sooner it is submitted, the sooner the Court will be able to consider it. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 31, 2019. (lccck1) Modified on 12/31/2019 to correct formatting typos (kt).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Redlined Protective Order by CHRISTINA RONALDSON re #25 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Buie, Molly)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ERRATA by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS #25 MOTION for Protective Order filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pak, Yoora)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Protective Order by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pak, Yoora)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received #23 Defendant's Notice Regarding Status of E-Discovery Search. Pursuant to the teleconference with the Court on December 13, 2019, Defendant informed the Court about the status of its e-discovery searches. Defendant further requests an extension of the deadline to respond to Plaintiff's e-discovery requests until February 14, 2020. The Court has further received #24 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Notice Regarding Status of E-Discovery Search. Plaintiff objects to the extension of this deadline and notes that the parties did not confer about the requested extension. The deadline for responses to e-discovery searches is not a deadline set by this Court, but rather one originally agreed upon by the parties. See #16 Joint Discovery Plan. Moreover, the parties have not yet conferred upon extension of this deadline, which the Court requires. See #15 Scheduling and Procedures Order. Accordingly, the parties shall meet and confer regarding Defendant's request and, if the parties are unable to agree upon a deadline, shall contact the Court for a teleconference pursuant to this Court's procedures as explained in its #15 Scheduling and Procedures Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 20, 2019. (lccck1)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #22 Consent Motion to Extend Time for Parties to File Draft Protective Order, in which Plaintiff requests that the deadline for the parties to file redlined versions of the proposed draft protective order be extended until Friday, December 20, 2019. Although this request was untimely filed on the date of the previous deadline, for good cause shown and with the parties' consent, that Motion is GRANTED. The deadline is extended until DECEMBER 20, 2019. The Court originally explained to the parties that if they submitted the proposed protective order drafts by December 18, 2019, the Court could enter a protective order by December 20, 2019. If the parties submit these drafts at a later date, as requested, the parties should not expect a protective order to be entered any earlier than December 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 20, 2019. (lccck1)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE to Def. Notice re: eDiscovery Search by CHRISTINA RONALDSON re #23 Notice (Other) (Seldon, Robert) Modified text on 12/20/2019 (ztd).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Pak, Yoora)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Buie, Molly)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly E. Buie on behalf of CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Buie, Molly)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court held a on-the-record discovery teleconference on December 13, 2019 at which counsel for both parties were present. The parties discussed with the Court their concerns regarding discovery and agreed to certain dates in an attempt to address those concerns. If the parties have any further discovery disputes, they shall contact Chambers in accordance with the Court's #15 Scheduling and Procedures Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 16, 2019. (lccck1)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference on the record held on 12/13/2019. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards.) (dot)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 12/13/2019 at 2:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #20 Request for a Discovery Conference. Plaintiff indicates that it has not been able to coordinate with counsel for Defendant to place a joint call into Chambers regarding the parties' discovery disputes in accordance with the Courts #7 Order Establishing Procedures and #15 Scheduling and Procedures Order. Plaintiff requests a discovery conference with Chambers regarding certain disputes between the parties. Accordingly, the Court shall schedule an on-the-record telephone conference to address these disputes for this upcoming Friday, DECEMBER 13, 2019, at 2:00 PM. The parties shall jointly call the Chambers line. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 12, 2019. (lccck1)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION FOR HEARING for Discovery Conference by CHRISTINA RONALDSON re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,,,,, (Seldon, Robert) Modified on 12/16/2019 (ztd).
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Maryan Alexander on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Alexander, Maryan)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #18 Motion to Extend Due Date for Responses to Written Discovery. In the Motion, Plaintiff explains that counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant had agreed to extend the deadline for the parties to provide written discovery response by thirty days. Plaintiff requests that the Court allow such an extension, as counsel for Plaintiff has been unable to get in touch with counsel for Defendant due to an emergency. The Court will not explicitly order that an extension is granted because the deadline to provide written discovery responses, as far as this Court can tell, was not a date set by the Court. This was a date agreed upon by the parties in their joint discovery plans. See Joint Discovery Plan, ECF No. #16 ; Amended Joint Discovery Plan, ECF No. #17 . If the parties want to amend dates that they have agreed upon, but have not been adopted by this Court, they may do so without seeking leave from this Court. If these extensions impact dates set by the Court, such as the end of discovery or Rule 26(a)(2)(B) disclosures, see Scheduling and Procedures Order, ECF No. #15 , the parties may seek from this Court extensions of those dates. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 27, 2019. (lccck1)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Written Discovery by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Seldon, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Motion to amend the Complaint due by 1/31/2020. (dot)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' #17 Amended Joint Discovery Plan, which includes the parties' proposed deadline for any motion to amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file any motion to amend her #1 Complaint by no later than JANUARY 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 21, 2019. (lcckk1)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Amended Joint Discovery Plan. (Seldon, Robert) Modified event title on 8/21/2019 (znmw).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' #16 Joint Discovery Plan. The parties did not specify a deadline for any motion to amend, which the Court expected to be included here. However, in light of potential ambiguity in the Court's #15 Scheduling and Procedures Order, which indicated generally that this deadline was "to be provided," the Court shall give one further opportunity. Unless the parties submit an Amended Joint Discovery Plan by AUGUST 21, 2019, proposing a deadline for any motion to amend, Plaintiff shall not be permitted any opportunity to move to amend her #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 20, 2019. (lcckk1)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT /Discovery Plan by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Pak, Yoora)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 1, 2019. (lcckk1)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 8/1/2019. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/19/2019. Initial Disclosure due by 9/4/2019. Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 1/13/2020; Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 3/1/2020; and Replies, if any, due by 3/31/2020. Status Conference set for 5/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards.) (dot)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Pak, Yoora)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #13 Consent Motion to Re-Schedule Initial Status Conference ("Motion"). That Initial Scheduling Conference is currently scheduled for July 10, 2019. Defendant has consented. Accordingly, the Court shall GRANT Plaintiff's Motion. In light of the Court's calendar, the Initial Scheduling Conference shall be rescheduled for AUGUST 1, 2019, at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 2, 2019. (lcckk1)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference reset for 8/1/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Continue Re-Schedule Initial Status Conference by CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seldon, Robert) Modified event title on 7/3/2019 (znmw).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for JULY 10, 2019, at 10:30 AM. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 14, 2019. (lcckk1)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (Grant, David)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Yoora Pak on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS Substituting for attorney David A. Grant (Pak, Yoora)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defense to Complaint by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS.(Pak, Yoora)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or other response due by 6/14/2019. (dot)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendant's #8 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, which seeks additional time for Defendant to investigate and prepare a response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Accordingly, with Plaintiff's consent, the Court shall GRANT Defendant's #8 Consent Motion, for good cause shown. Defendant's answer or other response shall be filed by no later than JUNE 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 6, 2019. (lcckk1)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS (Grant, David)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/23/19. (DM)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/9/2019, (ztd)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019 (Seldon, Robert) Modified on 4/23/2019 to select correct party served (ztd).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. (ztd)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by CHRISTINA RONALDSON.(Seldon, Robert)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene Bofinger on behalf of CHRISTINA RONALDSON (Bofinger, Charlene)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Omar Vincent Melehy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Melehy, Omar)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, )
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christina Ronaldson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6057763) filed by Christina Ronaldson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Seldon, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RONALDSON v. NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Ronaldson
Represented By: Robert C. Seldon
Represented By: Charlene Bofinger
Represented By: Omar Vincent Melehy
Represented By: Molly E. Buie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS
Represented By: David A. Grant
Represented By: Yoora Pak
Represented By: Maryan Alexander
Represented By: Theresa M. Connolly
Represented By: Daniel E. Farrington
Represented By: Samantha Sherwood Bononno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?