BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY v. ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC.

Plaintiff: BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01052
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- William M. Royston ; Letter to the Court This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file denied See Local Rules 5.1, 5.2". Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/8/2019. (zrdj)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019 (Kurtz, Chad)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave of Mark E. Opalisky to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/18/19. (DMK)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Complaint filed by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY.(Kurtz, Chad)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark E. Opaliksy, :Firm- Cozen O'Connor, :Address- 1650 Market Street, Suite 2800, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Phone No. - (215) 665-2729. Fax No. - (215) 701-2429 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6059699. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Chad)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Kurtz, Chad)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6059465) filed by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kurtz, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY v. ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Chad E. Kurtz
Represented By: Mark E. Opalisky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL-PRO SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?