CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. v. BERNHARDT et al
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT and U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01071
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1540
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Plaintiff's Complaint due by 8/15/2019. (mac)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time to respond to complaint. Defendants shall answer, or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint, by no later than August 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/21/2019. (lcegs2)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yang, Hao-Chin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hao-Chin Hubert Yang on behalf of All Defendants (Yang, Hao-Chin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/30/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/29/2019. (Shannon, Ryan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/26/19. (Shannon, Ryan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID BERNHARDT served on 4/23/2019; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 4/23/2019 (Shannon, Ryan)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/24/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Shannon, Ryan)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. Case related to Case No. 10-cv-00230. (Atwood, Amy)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6064167) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Atwood, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. v. BERNHARDT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.
Represented By: Ryan Adair Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Represented By: Hao-Chin Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Hao-Chin Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?