SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. BRIMSTONE ALLON ENTERPRISES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH, RODERICK S. BASHIR, STEPHEN ABRECHT, KEVIN MCGARR, THOMAS LAMARTINA, INGA CRAREY, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, DAVID HUERTA, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, EDWARD J. MANKO, APRIL VERRETT and FRANK A. MAXSON
Defendant: DIANE M. VALWAY, BRIMSTONE ALLON ENTERPRISES, LLC and RICK VALWAY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01092
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 8/30/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/13/2019. (lckbj1)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by STEPHEN ABRECHT, RODERICK S. BASHIR, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, INGA CRAREY, DAVID HUERTA, THOMAS LAMARTINA, EDWARD J. MANKO, FRANK A. MAXSON, KEVIN MCGARR, EMANUEL PASTREICH, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, APRIL VERRETT (Thuell, Mary)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/16/2019. (lckbj3)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 6/17/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/9/2019. (lckbj1)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by STEPHEN ABRECHT, RODERICK S. BASHIR, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, INGA CRAREY, DAVID HUERTA, THOMAS LAMARTINA, EDWARD J. MANKO, FRANK A. MAXSON, KEVIN MCGARR, EMANUEL PASTREICH, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, APRIL VERRETT (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Thuell, Mary)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BRIMSTONE ALLON ENTERPRISES, LLC served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; DIANE M VALWAY served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; RICK VALWAY served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019 (Thuell, Mary)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BRIMSTONE ALLON ENTERPRISES, LLC, DIANE M VALWAY, RICK VALWAY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIMSTONE ALLON ENTERPRISES, LLC, DIANE M VALWAY, RICK VALWAY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6067415) filed by JOHN J. SHERIDAN, EDWARD J. MANKO, STEPHEN ABRECHT, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, FRANK A. MAXSON, APRIL VERRETT, RODERICK S. BASHIR, INGA CRAREY, KEVIN MCGARR, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, DAVID HUERTA, THOMAS LAMARTINA, EMANUEL PASTREICH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)(Thuell, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. BRIMSTONE ALLON ENTERPRISES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE M. VALWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIMSTONE ALLON ENTERPRISES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK VALWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODERICK S. BASHIR
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN ABRECHT
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN MCGARR
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS LAMARTINA
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGA CRAREY
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. SHERIDAN
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HUERTA
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD J. MANKO
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL VERRETT
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK A. MAXSON
Represented By: Mary W. Thuell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?