D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. L.F. JENNINGS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Defendant: JOHNSON DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATES, INC. and L.F. JENNINGS, INC.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: JSF MANAGEMENT, LLC and JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: POWERS BROWN ARCHITECTURE OF VIRGINIA, LLC and BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01126
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 31 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC (Andrews, Stephan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Count V of Third-Party Complaint by BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Andrews, Stephan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #21 Third Party Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC by BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC. Related document: #21 Third Party Complaint, filed by JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC, JSF MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Andrews, Stephan)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Case STAYED was entered in error. Discovery only is STAYED until further Order of the Court. (znbn)
July 2, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Stayed until further Order of the Court. (znbn) Modified on 7/2/2019 (znbn).
July 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 7/2/2019. Discovery to be STAYED until further Order of the Court. Status Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (znbn) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct entry (znbn).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's scheduling conference, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Discovery is STAYED until further Order of the Court, although the parties may continue to voluntarily exchange initial disclosures; and 2) The parties shall return for a status conference on January 7, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/2/2019. (lcjeb1)
June 27, 2019 Filing 28 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Pham, Tram)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of BRIAN S. GOODMAN. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/26/2019. (lcjeb1)
June 25, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian S. Goodman, :Firm- Kramon & Graham, P.A., :Address- One South Street, Suite 2600. Phone No. - 410-752-6030. Fax No. - 410-539-1269 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6213693. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by L.F. JENNINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Brian S. Goodman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Evans, Beth)
June 24, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Initial Scheduling Conference set for July 2, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED AND RESET for July 2, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/24/2019. (lcjeb1)
June 13, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Crossclaim #20 of JSF 2nd Street NE CMPI, LLC by L.F. JENNINGS, INC..(Evans, Beth)
June 13, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Crossclaim #19 of JSF Management, LLC by L.F. JENNINGS, INC..(Evans, Beth)
June 13, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to Bohler Engineering VA, PLLC, Powers Brown Architecture of Virginia, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (tth)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JSF MANAGEMENT, LLC (Das, Debolina)
June 12, 2019 Filing 22 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC (Das, Debolina)
June 12, 2019 Filing 21 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Bohler Engineering VA, PLLC, Powers Brown Architecture of Virginia, LLC filed by JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC, JSF MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC SUMMONS, #2 Summons POWERS BROWN ARCHITECTURE OF VIRGINIA, LLC SUMMONS)(Das, Debolina)
May 30, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against L.F. JENNINGS, INC. by JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC.(Das, Debolina)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against L.F. JENNINGS, INC. by JSF MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Das, Debolina)
May 28, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Initial Scheduling Conference set for May 30, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED AND RESET for July 2, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/28/2019. (lcjeb1)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by L.F. JENNINGS, INC..(Evans, Beth)
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Pham, Tram)
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service on JSF 2nd Street NE CMPI LLC and JSF Management LLC by D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Pham, Tram)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC, JSF MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (tth)
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Requesting Issuance of Summons by D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Attachments: #1 Summons JSF Management, #2 Summons JSF 2nd Street)(Pham, Tram)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Johnson Development Associates, Inc. (Pham, Tram)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against L.F. JENNINGS, INC., JSF 2nd Street NE CMPI, LLC, JSF Management, LLC with Jury Demand filed by D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Attachments: #1 Redline - Amended Complaint)(Pham, Tram)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Pham, Tram)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Debolina Das on behalf of JOHNSON DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATES, INC. (Das, Debolina)
May 2, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for May 30, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 25. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/2/2019. (lcjeb2)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Crossclaim Answer to Johnson Development Associates, Inc.'s Cross-Claim [8-1] by L.F. JENNINGS, INC..(Evans, Beth); Modified text and added docket entry relationship on 5/2/2019 (tth).
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to the Clerk and Supplement to the Record on Removal filed by L.F. JENNINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Johnson Development Associates, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint and Cross-Claim Against LFJ, #2 Exhibit Johnson Development Associates, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Evans, Beth)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to the Clerk and Supplement to the Record on Removal by L.F. JENNINGS, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Johnson Development Associates, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint and Cross-Claim Against LFJ, #2 Exhibit Johnson Development Associates, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Evans, Beth)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by L.F. JENNINGS, INC. (Evans, Beth)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by L.F. JENNINGS, INC..(Evans, Beth)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tram T. Pham on behalf of D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Pham, Tram)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA Revised Notice of Removal Pursuant to LCVR 5.1(c) by L.F. JENNINGS, INC. #1 Notice of Removal, filed by L.F. JENNINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Documents from Superior Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Beth)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zef, )
April 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019CA001848b Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6071745 filed by L.F. JENNINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Documents from Superior Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Beth) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/22/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. L.F. JENNINGS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Debolina Das
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.F. JENNINGS, INC.
Represented By: Beth Patricia Evans
Represented By: Brian S. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Represented By: Tram T. Pham
Represented By: Curtis Aaron Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: JSF MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Debolina Das
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC
Represented By: Debolina Das
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: POWERS BROWN ARCHITECTURE OF VIRGINIA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC
Represented By: Stephan F. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?