UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JD EQUIPMENT DE MEXICO, S DE R.L. DE CV et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JD EQUIPMENT DE MEXICO, S DE R.L. DE CV, SOUTH POINT EQUIPMENT, LLC and ALEXIS DUBOURDIEN URDANGARIN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01152
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. JD EQUIPMENT DE MEXICO, S DE R.L. DE CV waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; SOUTH POINT EQUIPMENT, LLC waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; ALEXIS DUBOURDIEN URDANGARIN waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Truong, John)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JD EQUIPMENT DE MEXICO, S DE R.L. DE CV, SOUTH POINT EQUIPMENT, LLC, ALEXIS DUBOURDIEN URDANGARIN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (tth)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Alexis Dubourdieu Urdangarin; JD Equipment de Mexic, S de R.L. de CV, and South Point Equipment LLC re Summons Not Issued filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related document: Summons Not Issued. (Attachments: #1 Summons for South Point Equipment LLC, #2 Summons for JD Equipment de Mexico)(Truong, John)
April 23, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to JD EQUIPMENT DE MEXICO, S DE R.L. DE CV, SOUTH POINT EQUIPMENT, LLC, ALEXIS DUBOURDIEN URDANGARIN. (zef, )
April 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Truong, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/23/2019) (zef, ). Modified to replace United States of America with All Defendants on 4/23/2019 (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JD EQUIPMENT DE MEXICO, S DE R.L. DE CV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD EQUIPMENT DE MEXICO, S DE R.L. DE CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH POINT EQUIPMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXIS DUBOURDIEN URDANGARIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: John Cuong Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?