LOVELACE v. MEDSTAR HEALTH, INC. et al
Plaintiff: LISA LOVELACE
Defendant: LAURA S. JOHNSON, MEDSTAR MEDICAL GROUP II, LLC, MEDSTAR HEALTH, INC., KEVIN WELLS, MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER, INC, MEDSTAR PHYSICIAN PARTNERS, INC., ARJUN KANURI and WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01154
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by KEVIN WELLS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Spence, Andrew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to LISA LOVELACE. Attorney Erienne A Sutherell terminated. (Sutherell, Erienne)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN WELLS served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 (Hansel, Cary)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by LISA LOVELACE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hansel, Cary)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for Civil Case Nos. 19-cv-1154, 19-cv-1174, and 19-cv-1193, for July 10, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 23A. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 13, 2019. (AG)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint, by WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER CORPORATION.(Spence, Andrew)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of plaintiff's filing of an Amended Complaint on 5/31/2019 (ECF No. #12 ), it is hereby ORDERED that defendants' pending motions to dismiss the complaint for lack of jurisdiction (ECF No. #9 and #11 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 3, 2019. (AG)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LISA LOVELACE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutherell, Erienne)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ARJUN KANURI, WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER CORPORATION, KEVIN WELLS with Jury Demand filed by LISA LOVELACE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Red-line Copy, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Sutherell, Erienne)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by LAURA S. JOHNSON, ARJUN KANURI, KEVIN WELLS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Spence, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MEDSTAR HEALTH, INC., MEDSTAR MEDICAL GROUP II, LLC, MEDSTAR PHYSICIAN PARTNERS, INC., MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER, INC, WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER CORPORATION (Spence, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MEDSTAR HEALTH, INC., MEDSTAR MEDICAL GROUP II, LLC, MEDSTAR PHYSICIAN PARTNERS, INC., MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER, INC, WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spence, Andrew)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (1) reissued Electronically as to MEDSTAR HEALTH, INC. (jf) .
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (1) reissued Electronically as to MEDSTAR HEALTH, INC.. (jf)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by LISA LOVELACE.(Hansel, Cary)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to KEVIN WELLS. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to LAURA S. JOHNSON, ARJUN KANURI, MEDSTAR HEALTH, INC., MEDSTAR MEDICAL GROUP II, LLC, MEDSTAR PHYSICIAN PARTNERS, INC., MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER, INC, WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
April 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zef, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by LISA LOVELACE re #1 Complaint, filed by LISA LOVELACE. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by LISA LOVELACE.(Sutherell, Erienne A.) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/24/2019) (zef, ).
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by LISA LOVELACE. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by LISA LOVELACE.(Sutherell, Erienne A.)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6075136) filed by LISA LOVELACE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Sutherell, Erienne A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOVELACE v. MEDSTAR HEALTH, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA S. JOHNSON
Represented By: Andrew J. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDSTAR MEDICAL GROUP II, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDSTAR HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Andrew J. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN WELLS
Represented By: Andrew J. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDSTAR WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER, INC
Represented By: Andrew J. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDSTAR PHYSICIAN PARTNERS, INC.
Represented By: Andrew J. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARJUN KANURI
Represented By: Andrew J. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER CORPORATION
Represented By: Andrew J. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA LOVELACE
Represented By: Erienne A Sutherell
Represented By: Cary Johnson Hansel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?