ANHAM FZCO et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
Plaintiff: ANHAM FZCO and ANHAM USA, INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY and PATRICK M. SHANAHAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01218
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/23/19. (DJS)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #22 Stipulation of Dismissal; emailed to aramana@vedderprice.com, cc'd 10 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Letters are not required when filing. (ztd, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ANHAM FZCO, ANHAM USA, INC.. (Ramana, Anand) (Main Document 22 replaced to remove cover letter on 5/23/2019) (znmw).
May 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 5/22/2019. Reply due by 5/24/2019. (tb)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties' #20 Joint Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule is denied. The parties' #21 Amended Joint Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule is granted. Defendants' Opposition shall be filed on or before May 22, 2019. Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed on or before May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/17/2019. (lctsc3)
May 17, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply by ANHAM FZCO, ANHAM USA, INC. (Ramana, Anand)
May 16, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply by PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Hendry, Melanie)
May 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 5/17/2019. Reply due by 5/24/2019. (tb)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #19 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendants' Opposition shall be filed on or before May 17, 2019. Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed on or before May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/10/19. (DJS)
May 10, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply, Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule (Amended) by PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Hendry, Melanie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by ANHAM FZCO, ANHAM USA, INC. re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E - Part 1, #6 Exhibit E - Part 2, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q)(Ramana, Anand)
May 6, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #15 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance; emailed to aramana@vedderprice.com, cc'd 9 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Eric J. Marcotte is not listed as counsel for this case. (ztd, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 17 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Part 2 - Pages 732-1339) by PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Hendry, Melanie)
May 3, 2019 Filing 16 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Part 1 - Index and Pages 1-731) by PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Hendry, Melanie)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part #4 #12 #13 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Jeffrey M. Lowry, Kelly E. Buroker, and Tamara Droubi may be heard in open court on behalf of Plaintiffs, but may not file papers in this court. See Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) ("An attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar AND the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court."). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/2/19. (DJS)
May 2, 2019 Filing 15 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ANHAM FZCO, ANHAM USA, INC.. (Ramana, Anand) Modified on 5/6/2019 (ztd).
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by ANHAM FZCO, ANHAM USA, INC. re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey M. Lowry, :Firm- VEDDER PRICE P.C., :Address- 1401 I Street, N.W. Suite 1100, Washington, D.C. 20005. Phone No. - (202) 312-3034. Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Ramana, Anand) Modified text to delete "no" fee paid on 5/2/2019 (ztd).
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tamara Droubi, :Firm- Vedder Price P.C., :Address- 1401 I Street, NW, Suite 1100, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-312-3368. Fax No. - 202-312-3320 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6095553. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANHAM FZCO, ANHAM USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramana, Anand)
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kelly E. Buroker, :Firm- Vedder Price P.C., :Address- 1401 I Street, NW, Suite 1100, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-312-3339. Fax No. - 202-312-3320 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6095547. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANHAM FZCO, ANHAM USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramana, Anand)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd)
April 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice and/or Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/3/2019. Administrative Record due by 5/6/2019. Defendants' Opposition due by 5/13/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 5/20/2019. (zjd)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A more expedited briefing schedule is required than proposed #8 by Defendants. The Administrative Record shall be served and filed by May 6, 2019. Defendants' Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Motion is due by May 13, 2019. Plaintiffs' Reply is due by May 20, 2019. The court will notify the parties if it believes oral argument is necessary. Defendants shall inform the court by May 3, 2019 if they are willing to extend the voluntary stay of the contract award under Solicitation No. SPE300-17-R-0018. If so, the parties shall meet and confer and propose a new briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/30/2019. (lctsc3)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ANHAM FZCO, ANHAM USA, INC..(Ramana, Anand)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Hendry, Melanie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Hendry, Melanie)
April 26, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Summons (3) Issued as to PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (ztd) Modified on 5/3/2019 (ztd).
April 26, 2019 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/26/2019 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ANHAM USA, INC., ANHAM FZCO; motion heard and DENIED AS MOOT. Given that the parties have agreed to extend the deadline, a joint proposed briefing schedule on the preliminary injunction is due by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, April 29, 2019. (Court Reporter Sara Wick) (tb)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The court will hold a phone conference at 2:30 p.m. today. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/26/2019. (lctsc3)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by ANHAM FZCO, ANHAM USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ramana, Anand)
April 26, 2019 Summons (3) Issued as to PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (ztd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANHAM USA, INC. (ztd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANHAM FZCO (ztd)
April 26, 2019 Filing fee received for Pro Hac Vice Motion re #4 : $ 100.00, receipt number: 4616097786. (ztd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey M. Lowry, :Firm- VEDDER PRICE P.C., :Address- 1401 I Street, N.W. Suite 1100, Washington, D.C. 20005. Phone No. - (202) 312-3034. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANHAM FZCO, ANHAM USA, INC. (ztd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ANHAM FZCO, ANHAM USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Jay Ward, #3 Exhibit A-Q Part 1, #4 Exhibit A-Q Part 2, #5 Exhibit A-Q Part 3, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2019: #7 Certification of Counsel) (ztd).
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ANHAM USA, INC., ANHAM FZCO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Jay Ward, #3 Exhibit A-Q Part 1, #4 Exhibit A-Q Part 2, #5 Exhibit A-Q Part 3, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616097786) filed by ANHAM FZCO, ANHAM USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ztd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANHAM FZCO et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Melanie Dyani Hendry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY
Represented By: Melanie Dyani Hendry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK M. SHANAHAN
Represented By: Melanie Dyani Hendry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANHAM FZCO
Represented By: Kevin Paul Connelly
Represented By: Anand Vijay Ramana
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Lowry
Represented By: Kelly E. Buroker
Represented By: Tamara Droubi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANHAM USA, INC.
Represented By: Kevin Paul Connelly
Represented By: Anand Vijay Ramana
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Lowry
Represented By: Kelly E. Buroker
Represented By: Tamara Droubi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?