WORKMAN v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: GARY D. WORKMAN
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01252
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405rd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14, #14 Part 15, #15 Part 16, #16 Part 17)(Reed, Margaret)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NANCY A. BERRYHILL.(Reed, Margaret)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zmc)
June 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion due by 7/12/2019. Response and Motion due by 8/26/2019. Reply and Response due by 9/9/2019. (tb)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Status Report #7 , Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction #3 will terminated. Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment of Reversal is due July 12, 2019. Defendant's Combined Motion for Judgment of Affirmance and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment of Reversal is due August 26, 2019. Plaintiff's Combined Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment of Affirmance and Reply to Defendant's Opposition is due September 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/3/2019. (lctsc3)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (ztd);(See docket entry no. #7 to view.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Telephone Conference, Set Deadlines Jointly Filed by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Margaret)
May 30, 2019 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 5/30/2019 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Parties shall notify the Court regarding an agreement by 4:00 on 5/31/2019. (Court Reporter Nancy Meyer) (tb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Winslow Reed on behalf of NANCY A. BERRYHILL (Reed, Margaret)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A telephone conference is hereby set for 3:00 pm on Thursday May 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/28/19. (DJS)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Case reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan as there is an earlier related case. Judge Reggie B. Walton is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
May 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/07/2019. (zad) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/15/2019) (zsb). Modified on 5/15/2019 (zsb).
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by GARY D. WORKMAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zrdj)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GARY D. WORKMAN (zrdj)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL filed by GARY D. WORKMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj)
April 30, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 4/30/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WORKMAN v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY D. WORKMAN
Represented By: R. Scott McNeilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Represented By: Margaret Winslow Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?