TEAMSTERS LOCAL 639 -- EMPLOYERS PENSION TRUST et al v. SHEPARD EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: ERIC D. WEISS, ANTHONY SMITH, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 639 -- EMPLOYERS HEALTH TRUST, PHILIP GILES, THOMAS E. RATLIFF, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 639 -- EMPLOYERS PENSION TRUST, FORREST HARVEY, JOHN GIBSON, MICHAEL R. BULL, RAYMOND HOWARD and FRANK W. STEGMAN
Defendant: SHEPARD EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01288
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SHEPARD EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019 (Bardes, Diana)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SHEPARD EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHEPARD EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6100808) filed by RAYMOND HOWARD, MICHAEL R. BULL, JOHN GIBSON, FRANK W. STEGMAN, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 639 -- EMPLOYERS HEALTH TRUST, THOMAS E. RATLIFF, ERIC D. WEISS, TEAMSTERS LOCAL 639 -- EMPLOYERS PENSION TRUST, PHILIP GILES, ANTHONY SMITH, FORREST HARVEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Bardes, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEAMSTERS LOCAL 639 -- EMPLOYERS PENSION TRUST et al v. SHEPARD EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC D. WEISS
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY SMITH
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEAMSTERS LOCAL 639 -- EMPLOYERS HEALTH TRUST
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP GILES
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS E. RATLIFF
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEAMSTERS LOCAL 639 -- EMPLOYERS PENSION TRUST
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORREST HARVEY
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN GIBSON
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL R. BULL
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND HOWARD
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK W. STEGMAN
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHEPARD EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?