SMALL v. OFFICE OF CONGRESSMAN HENRY CUELLAR

Plaintiff: KRISTIE SMALL
Defendant: OFFICE OF CONGRESSMAN HENRY CUELLAR
Case Number: 1:2019cv01314
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF CONGRESSMAN HENRY CUELLAR with Jury Demand filed by KRISTIE SMALL.(McDonough, Sara)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista Kate Wallace on behalf of KRISTIE SMALL (Wallace, Krista)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 05/08/2019. (lctnm2)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF CONGRESSMAN HENRY CUELLAR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF CONGRESSMAN HENRY CUELLAR with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6106505) filed by KRISTIE SMALL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #4 Summons Rep. Henry Cuellar)(McDonough, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMALL v. OFFICE OF CONGRESSMAN HENRY CUELLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF CONGRESSMAN HENRY CUELLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTIE SMALL
Represented By: Sara N. McDonough
Represented By: Krista Kate Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?