OCAMPO-WIECHMANN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: SYLVIA OCAMPO-WIECHMANN
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01320
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Referring Judge: Deborah A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc)
May 29, 2019 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for full case management up to and excluding trial. (zad)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING Case to Random Magistrate Judge for Full Case Management. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/29/2019. (lcjeb2)
May 28, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED". Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/22/2019. (zrdj)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SYLVIA OCAMPO-WIECHMANN (zsb)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by SYLVIA OCAMPO-WIECHMANN. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb)
May 6, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/06/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OCAMPO-WIECHMANN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA OCAMPO-WIECHMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?