ALRIDGE v. G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS

Plaintiff: Courtney Aldridge and COURTNEY T. ALRIDGE
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions and G4 SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01360
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #13 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/8/2019. (lcjeb2)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant's #8 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; and (2) It shall respond to the Complaint by July 22, 2019. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/8/2019. (lcjeb2)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #12 Reply to Document; emailed to william.sherman@dinsmore.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Please do not refile. In the future, the ECF login and signature must match. (ztth, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY re #11 Memorandum in Opposition filed by G4 SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC.. (Sherman, William)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by COURTNEY T. ALRIDGE. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A - C) (tth)
June 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Respond by 6/19/2019. (znbn)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's #8 Motion to Dismiss on or before June 19, 2019. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/5/2019. (lcjeb2)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of JENNIFER POPE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/30/2019. (lcjeb2)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer Pope, :Firm- Dinsmore & Shohl LLP, :Address- 900 Wilshire Drive, Ste. 300. Phone No. - 248-647-6000. Fax No. - 248-647-5210 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6155408. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by G4 SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sherman, William)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by G4 SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sherman, William)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to COURTNEY T. ALRIDGE. Attorney Arinderjit Dhali terminated. (Dhali, Arinderjit)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #5 Errata, #3 Errata, #1 Notice of Removal. (zef, )
May 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA by G4 SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC. #1 Notice of Removal filed by G4 SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Counsel/Party, #2 Exhibit)(Sherman, William)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Sherman, II on behalf of All Defendants (Sherman, William)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA attaching Exhibits A and B by G4S Secure Solutions #1 Notice of Removal filed by G4S Secure Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sherman, William)
May 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #2 Notice (Other) was entered in error at the request of counsel and will be refiled. (jf)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Removal by G4S Secure Solutions re #1 Notice of Removal (Sherman, William) Modified on 5/10/2019 (jf).
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 19-0002447 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6116683 filed by G4S Secure Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sherman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALRIDGE v. G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY T. ALRIDGE
Represented By: Arinderjit Dhali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions
Represented By: William A. Sherman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4 SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC.
Represented By: William A. Sherman, II
Represented By: Jennifer Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?