PROVIDENCE SAINT PETER HOSPITAL et al v. ALEX M. AZAR II
Plaintiff: VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH CAMPUS, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL ARDMORE, KADLEC REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE ALASKA MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL JOPLIN, SWEDISH EDMONDS CAMPUS, SWEDISH FIRST HILL CAMPUS, PROVIDENCE SAINT PETER HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH DEER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, MULTICARE AUBURN MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SMITH, PROVIDENCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER EVERETT COLBY CAMPUS, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, MULTICARE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, HARBORVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON MEDICAL CENTER, SWEDISH ISSAQUAH CAMPUS, HEALTH FIRST CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE SAINT PATRICK HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL SPRINGFIELD, HEALTH FIRST HOLMES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DCH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, MERCY HOSPITAL LEBANON, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE THOMPSON PEAK MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE OSBORN MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON, NORTHPORT MEDICAL CENTER, RUBY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SCOTT, PROVIDENCE HOLY FAMILY HOSPITAL, MERCY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE SHEA MEDICAL CENTER, BERKELEY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SACRED HEART MEDICAL CENTER AND CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, MULTICARE TACOMA GENERAL HOSPITAL, SWEDISH CHERRY HILL CAMPUS, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL CENTER, FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL NORTHWEST ARKANSAS, METHODIST HOSPITAL, MERCY HOSPITAL WASHINGTON, ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER, CHI ST. VINCENT HOT SPRINGS and MERCY HOSPITAL INDEPENDENCE
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01363
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #8 Notice of Appearance; emailed to serena.m.orloff@usdoj.gov, cc'd 8 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Said pleading was filed in the correct case. (ztd, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC et al.(Orloff, Serena) Modified on 6/13/2019 (ztd).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has before it fifteen cases that have been consolidated and stayed pending the Supreme Court's decision on the merits in Azar v. Allina Health Services, No. 17-1484. The Court directed the parties to file a joint status report within thirty (30) days of the Supreme Court's decision in that case. The Supreme Court issued its decision in Allina Health Services on June 3, 2019. So that it does not receive fifteen separate status reports, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a single consolidated joint status report reflecting the views of all plaintiffs in the consolidated case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/6/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC, 1:18-cv-01248-CRC, 1:18-cv-01385-CRC, 1:18-cv-01613-CRC, 1:18-cv-02171-CRC, 1:19-cv-00670-CRC, 1:19-cv-01008-CRC, 1:19-cv-01104-CRC, 1:19-cv-01181-CRC, 1:19-cv-01216-CRC, 1:19-cv-01363-CRC, 1:19-cv-01366-CRC, 1:19-cv-01445-CRC(lccrc1)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR II served on 5/17/2019 (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/17/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/16/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 15, 2019 Cases consolidated. Cases 19cv1363 and 18cv222 have been consolidated pursuant to Minute Order entered 5/15/19. From this date forward, all future filings in these cases shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222 The parties are advised NOT to select the SPREAD TEXT option when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (ztd)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case, 19-cv-1363, is hereby CONSOLIDATED with case 18-cv-222 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). All future filings in these cases shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. It is further ORDERED that the consolidated case will remain stayed. The parties shall file a joint status report within thirty days of the Supreme Court's decision on the merits in Azar v. Allina Health Services (No. 17-1484). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/15/2019. (lccrc1)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH CAMPUS, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON, BERKELEY MEDICAL CENTER, CHI ST. VINCENT HOT SPRINGS, DCH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER, HARBORVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, HEALTH FIRST CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, HEALTH FIRST HOLMES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH DEER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE OSBORN MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE SHEA MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE THOMPSON PEAK MEDICAL CENTER, KADLEC REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL ARDMORE, MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SCOTT, MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SMITH, MERCY HOSPITAL INDEPENDENCE, MERCY HOSPITAL JOPLIN, MERCY HOSPITAL LEBANON, MERCY HOSPITAL NORTHWEST ARKANSAS, MERCY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, MERCY HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, MERCY HOSPITAL SPRINGFIELD, MERCY HOSPITAL WASHINGTON, METHODIST HOSPITAL, MULTICARE AUBURN MEDICAL CENTER, MULTICARE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, MULTICARE TACOMA GENERAL HOSPITAL, NORTHPORT MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE ALASKA MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE HOLY FAMILY HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, PROVIDENCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER EVERETT COLBY CAMPUS, PROVIDENCE SACRED HEART MEDICAL CENTER AND CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT PATRICK HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE SAINT PETER HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER, RUBY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SWEDISH CHERRY HILL CAMPUS, SWEDISH EDMONDS CAMPUS, SWEDISH FIRST HILL CAMPUS, SWEDISH ISSAQUAH CAMPUS, UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 18-2171. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH CAMPUS, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON, BERKELEY MEDICAL CENTER, CHI ST. VINCENT HOT SPRINGS, DCH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER, HARBORVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, HEALTH FIRST CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, HEALTH FIRST HOLMES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH DEER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE OSBORN MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE SHEA MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE THOMPSON PEAK MEDICAL CENTER, KADLEC REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL ARDMORE, MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SCOTT, MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SMITH, MERCY HOSPITAL INDEPENDENCE, MERCY HOSPITAL JOPLIN, MERCY HOSPITAL LEBANON, MERCY HOSPITAL NORTHWEST ARKANSAS, MERCY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, MERCY HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, MERCY HOSPITAL SPRINGFIELD, MERCY HOSPITAL WASHINGTON, METHODIST HOSPITAL, MULTICARE AUBURN MEDICAL CENTER, MULTICARE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, MULTICARE TACOMA GENERAL HOSPITAL, NORTHPORT MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE ALASKA MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE HOLY FAMILY HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, PROVIDENCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER EVERETT COLBY CAMPUS, PROVIDENCE SACRED HEART MEDICAL CENTER AND CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT PATRICK HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE SAINT PETER HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER, RUBY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SWEDISH CHERRY HILL CAMPUS, SWEDISH EDMONDS CAMPUS, SWEDISH FIRST HILL CAMPUS, SWEDISH ISSAQUAH CAMPUS, UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6117330) filed by MERCY HOSPITAL NORTHWEST ARKANSAS, MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SCOTT, FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER, MULTICARE TACOMA GENERAL HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER EVERETT COLBY CAMPUS, PROVIDENCE SAINT PETER HOSPITAL, KADLEC REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT PATRICK HOSPITAL, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE SHEA MEDICAL CENTER, MULTICARE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, METHODIST HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL ARDMORE, PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHPORT MEDICAL CENTER, BERKELEY MEDICAL CENTER, MULTICARE AUBURN MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO, MERCY HOSPITAL INDEPENDENCE, CHI ST. VINCENT HOT SPRINGS, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER, HEALTH FIRST HOLMES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, HONORHEALTH DEER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER, HEALTH FIRST CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, HARBORVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE ALASKA MEDICAL CENTER, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON, MERCY HOSPITAL WASHINGTON, SWEDISH EDMONDS CAMPUS, MERCY HOSPITAL JOPLIN, PROVIDENCE SACRED HEART MEDICAL CENTER AND CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH CAMPUS, PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE, MERCY HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS, SWEDISH ISSAQUAH CAMPUS, RUBY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SWEDISH CHERRY HILL CAMPUS, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL LEBANON, SWEDISH FIRST HILL CAMPUS, MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SMITH, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE THOMPSON PEAK MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL SPRINGFIELD, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE OSBORN MEDICAL CENTER, DCH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE HOLY FAMILY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Secretary of HHS, #3 Summons US Attorney General, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROVIDENCE SAINT PETER HOSPITAL et al v. ALEX M. AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER SOUTH CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER TORRANCE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL ARDMORE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KADLEC REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE ALASKA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL JOPLIN
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SWEDISH EDMONDS CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SWEDISH FIRST HILL CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE SAINT PETER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HONORHEALTH DEER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MULTICARE AUBURN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SMITH
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER EVERETT COLBY CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MULTICARE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARBORVIEW MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SWEDISH ISSAQUAH CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH FIRST CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE SAINT PATRICK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL SPRINGFIELD
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH FIRST HOLMES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL SAINT LOUIS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL LEBANON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE THOMPSON PEAK MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE OSBORN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER - UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHPORT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUBY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SCOTT
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE HOLY FAMILY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY MEDICAL CENTER SAN PEDRO
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE SHEA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERKELEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE SACRED HEART MEDICAL CENTER AND CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MULTICARE TACOMA GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SWEDISH CHERRY HILL CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAYETTE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL NORTHWEST ARKANSAS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: METHODIST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL WASHINGTON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHI ST. VINCENT HOT SPRINGS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL INDEPENDENCE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?