ALVARADO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: HUNTINGTON BEACH HOSPITAL, CHINO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SHERMAN OAKS HOSPITAL, GARDEN CITY HOSPITAL, CENTINELA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ST MARY'S HOSPITAL, PASSAIC, KNAPP MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER, PAMPA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, WEST ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LA PALMA INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAINT MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HARLINGEN MEDICAL CENTER, ARROWHEAD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL, SHASTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BATON ROUGE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, ENCINO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAN DIMAS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PARADISE VALLEY HOSPITAL, MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ROXBOROUGH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL, ALVARADO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, GARDEN GROVE HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01378
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING ORDERS ISSUED IN SIMILAR CASES by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2019. (tg)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) EXTENDING, upon consideration of the parties' #11 Joint Status Report, the stay, and DIRECTING the parties to file a further joint status report by September 5, 2019, which status report shall propose a date for the filing of a motion to consolidate, unless such motion has been filed by then. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 3, 2019. (lcbah2)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED ORDER, #2 Text of Proposed Order PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED ORDER)(Marcus, Kenneth)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 17, 2019. (lcbah2)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 5/22/2019 (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/20/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/20/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/19/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests REVISED TO IDENTIFY PUBLICLY TRADED CORPORATION by ALVARADO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ARROWHEAD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BATON ROUGE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, CENTINELA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, CHINO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER, DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL, ENCINO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, GARDEN CITY HOSPITAL, GARDEN GROVE HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, HARLINGEN MEDICAL CENTER, HUNTINGTON BEACH HOSPITAL, KNAPP MEDICAL CENTER, LA PALMA INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, PAMPA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PARADISE VALLEY HOSPITAL, ROXBOROUGH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAN DIMAS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SHASTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SHERMAN OAKS HOSPITAL, ST MARY'S HOSPITAL, PASSAIC, WEST ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants filed by KNAPP MEDICAL CENTER, ST MARY'S HOSPITAL, PASSAIC, GARDEN CITY HOSPITAL, BATON ROUGE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, ROXBOROUGH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CENTINELA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALVARADO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAN DIMAS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, WEST ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PARADISE VALLEY HOSPITAL, LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, ENCINO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, CHINO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, HARLINGEN MEDICAL CENTER, LA PALMA INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SHERMAN OAKS HOSPITAL, PAMPA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, GARDEN GROVE HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER, ARROWHEAD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SHASTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HUNTINGTON BEACH HOSPITAL, DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Errata 2, #3 Exhibit Comparison Of Complaint)(Marcus, Kenneth)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 19-1051. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALVARADO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ARROWHEAD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BATON ROUGE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, CENTINELA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, CHINO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER, DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL, ENCINO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, GARDEN CITY HOSPITAL, GARDEN GROVE HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, HARLINGEN MEDICAL CENTER, HUNTINGTON BEACH HOSPITAL, KNAPP MEDICAL CENTER, LA PALMA INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, PAMPA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PARADISE VALLEY HOSPITAL, ROXBOROUGH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAN DIMAS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SHASTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SHERMAN OAKS HOSPITAL, ST MARY'S HOSPITAL, PASSAIC, WEST ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6120447) filed by KNAPP MEDICAL CENTER, ST MARY'S HOSPITAL, PASSAIC, GARDEN CITY HOSPITAL, BATON ROUGE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, ROXBOROUGH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CENTINELA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALVARADO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAN DIMAS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, WEST ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PARADISE VALLEY HOSPITAL, LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, ENCINO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, CHINO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, HARLINGEN MEDICAL CENTER, LA PALMA INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SHERMAN OAKS HOSPITAL, PAMPA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, GARDEN GROVE HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER, ARROWHEAD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SHASTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HUNTINGTON BEACH HOSPITAL, DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Summons Secretary of Health and Human Services, #4 Summons Attorney General Of The United States, #5 Summons UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALVARADO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUNTINGTON BEACH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHINO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERMAN OAKS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARDEN CITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTINELA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST MARY'S HOSPITAL, PASSAIC
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KNAPP MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMPA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA PALMA INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT MARY'S REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARLINGEN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARROWHEAD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHASTA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BATON ROUGE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENCINO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAN DIMAS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARADISE VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROXBOROUGH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVARADO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARDEN GROVE HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?