SMOCK v. LIPNIC et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH SMOCK
Defendant: VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, PAUL ROGERS, JOSEPH LENGYEL and HEATHER WILSON
Not Yet Classified: HEATHER A. WILSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv01381
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (7) Re-Issued Electronically as to JOSEPH LENGYEL, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, HEATHER WILSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and District of Columbia Attorney General. (jf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JOSEPH SMOCK. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Eisenberg, Michael)
June 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #5 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error. Incorrect summons submitted and issued. This is not a FOIA case and counsel is instructed to refile 21/60 day summons to be reissued.(jf)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to JOSEPH LENGYEL, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, PAUL ROGERS, PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, HEATHER WILSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) Modified on 6/13/2019 (zjf).
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by JOSEPH SMOCK. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by JOSEPH SMOCK. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Eisenberg, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zef, )
May 24, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to JOSEPH LENGYEL, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, PAUL ROGERS, PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, HEATHER WILSON. (zef, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JOSEPH SMOCK. Case related to Case No. 18-50438. (Eisenberg, Michael) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/24/2019) (zef, ).
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JOSEPH SMOCK. Case related to Case No. 19-1380. (Eisenberg, Michael) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/24/2019) (zef, ).
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against JOSEPH LENGYEL, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, PAUL ROGERS, PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, HEATHER A. WILSON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6120966) filed by JOSEPH SMOCK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eisenberg, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/24/2019) (zef, ). Modified text on 5/24/2019 (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMOCK v. LIPNIC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTORIA A. LIPNIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK M. SHANAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH LENGYEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HEATHER A. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH SMOCK
Represented By: Michael D.J. Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?