SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. M.R. OF AMBOY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH, RODERICK S. BASHIR, STEPHEN ABRECHT, KEVIN MCGARR, THOMAS LAMARTINA, INGA CRAREY, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, DAVID HUERTA, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, EDWARD J. MANKO, APRIL VERRETT and FRANK A. MAXSON
Defendant: H.W. OF AMBOY, LLC D/B/A AMBOY CARE CENTER, M.R. OF AMBOY, LLC D/B/A AMBOY CARE CENTER, H.W. OF AMBOY, LLC and M.R. OF AMBOY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01405
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to H.W. OF AMBOY, LLC. (tth)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to M.R. OF AMBOY, LLC. (tth)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by STEPHEN ABRECHT, RODERICK S. BASHIR, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, INGA CRAREY, DAVID HUERTA, THOMAS LAMARTINA, EDWARD J. MANKO, FRANK A. MAXSON, KEVIN MCGARR, EMANUEL PASTREICH, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, APRIL VERRETT. (Watts, Matthew)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. H.W. OF AMBOY, LLC served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019; M.R. OF AMBOY, LLC served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019 (Bardes, Diana)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to H.W. OF AMBOY, LLC, M.R. OF AMBOY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/16/2019) (zef, ).
May 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Watts on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Watts, Matthew)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against H.W. OF AMBOY, LLC D/B/A AMBOY CARE CENTER, M.R. OF AMBOY, LLC D/B/A AMBOY CARE CENTER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6125561) filed by APRIL VERRETT, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, RODERICK S. BASHIR, EDWARD J. MANKO, INGA CRAREY, KEVIN MCGARR, STEPHEN ABRECHT, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, DAVID HUERTA, THOMAS LAMARTINA, FRANK A. MAXSON, EMANUEL PASTREICH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Bardes, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. M.R. OF AMBOY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.W. OF AMBOY, LLC D/B/A AMBOY CARE CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R. OF AMBOY, LLC D/B/A AMBOY CARE CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.W. OF AMBOY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R. OF AMBOY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODERICK S. BASHIR
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN ABRECHT
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN MCGARR
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS LAMARTINA
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGA CRAREY
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. SHERIDAN
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HUERTA
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD J. MANKO
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL VERRETT
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK A. MAXSON
Represented By: Diana M. Bardes
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?