TIMBISHA SHOSHONE TRIBE v BERNHARDT ET AL
Plaintiff: TIMBISHA SHOSHONE TRIBE
Defendant: JAMES CASON, DAVID BERNHARDT and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Not Yet Classified: DAVID BERNHARDT, SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR and DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Case Number: 1:2019cv01430
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 ERRATA by TIMBISHA SHOSHONE TRIBE #6 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney, #8 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, #10 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, #5 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, #9 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant. (Tomaselli, Paige)
June 27, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error and refiled as to the correct party. (See Docket Entry #9 to view document)(jf)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Paige M. Tomaselli on behalf of TIMBISHA SHOSHONE TRIBE (Tomaselli, Paige) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/27/2019) (zjf).
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID BERNHARDT served on 5/29/2019 (Tomaselli, Paige)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 5/28/2019 (Tomaselli, Paige)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES CASON served on 5/28/2019 (Tomaselli, Paige)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TIMBISHA SHOSHONE TRIBE served on 5/28/2019 (Tomaselli, Paige) Modified on 6/27/2019 (jf).
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/28/2019. (Tomaselli, Paige)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General June 3, 2019. (Tomaselli, Paige)
June 24, 2019 Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Richard J. Leon is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, JAMES CASON, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zef, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by TIMBISHA SHOSHONE TRIBE. (Tomaselli, Paige)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TIMBISHA SHOSHONE TRIBE (Tomaselli, Paige)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAMES CASON, DAVID BERNHARDT, SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6129673) filed by TIMBISHA SHOSHONE TRIBE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Tomaselli, Paige)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TIMBISHA SHOSHONE TRIBE v BERNHARDT ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DAVID BERNHARDT, SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES CASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMBISHA SHOSHONE TRIBE
Represented By: Paige M. Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?