HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH et al v. AZAR

Plaintiff: HENDERSON COUNTY HOSPITAL CORP, HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH, PARDEE HOSPITAL and UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HOSPITALS AT CHAPEL HILL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01432
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 6/11/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/11/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/11/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/10/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return Receipts for Certified Mail)(Roth, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO APA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for batching motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/6/2019. (lckbj1)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
May 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zrdj)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HENDERSON COUNTY HOSPITAL CORP, HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HOSPITALS AT CHAPEL HILL (Roth, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6129974) filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HOSPITALS AT CHAPEL HILL, HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH, HENDERSON COUNTY HOSPITAL CORP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, #3 Summons to Hon. William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, #4 Summons to Hon. Jessie K. Liu, United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, #5 Summons to Robert P. Charrow, General Counsel, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Roth, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENDERSON COUNTY HOSPITAL CORP
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARDEE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HOSPITALS AT CHAPEL HILL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?