HORN v. JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC

Plaintiff: DIANE HORN
Defendant: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01433
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC (zrdj)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default by DIANE HORN (Weiner, Courtney)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by DIANE HORN re Order,, . (Weiner, Courtney)
July 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Show Cause due by 7/12/2019. (tg)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE, by July 12, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.23. The #1 Complaint was filed on May 17, 2019 and the defendant was served with the summons and Complaint on May 30, 2019, see #4 Return of Service/Affidavit, but no answer or other response has been timely filed and no other action taken in the case. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1)(A)(i). Accordingly, the plaintiff is ORDERED to submit, by July 12, 2019, an explanation as to why this case should not be dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 2, 2019. (lcbah4)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019 (Weiner, Courtney) Modified on 7/12/2019 to add answer due date (zrdj).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 21, 2019. (lcbah4)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6130029) filed by DIANE HORN. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weiner, Courtney) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/21/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HORN v. JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE HORN
Represented By: Courtney L. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?