BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: ALTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL, BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, PARKLAND HEALTH CENTER-FARMINGTON, BOONE HOSPITAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL NORTHWEST ARKANSAS, MERCY HOSPITAL ARDOMORE, MERCY HOSPITAL LEBANON, MERCY HOSPITAL INDEPENDENCE, MERCY HOSPITAL JOPLIN, MERCY HOSPITAL WASHINGTON, MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SCOTT, MERCY HOSPITAL SPRINGFIELD, MERCY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY, CHI ST. VINCENT HOT SPRINGS, MERCY HOSPITAL EL RENO and MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SMITH
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01445
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion due by 8/2/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC et al.(lsj)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 27 joint status report and the plaintiffs' 28 notice, it is HEREBY ORDERED that the case shall continue to be stayed. The government shall file its anticipated motion for consolidation on or before August 2, 2019. If the government's motion is granted, the parties shall take further action as directed in the consolidated case. Otherwise, the parties shall file a further joint status report within thirty days of any denial of the motion to consolidate. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC, 1:18-cv-01248-CRC, 1:18-cv-01385-CRC, 1:18-cv-01613-CRC, 1:18-cv-02171-CRC, 1:19-cv-00670-CRC, 1:19-cv-01008-CRC, 1:19-cv-01104-CRC, 1:19-cv-01150-CRC, 1:19-cv-01181-CRC, 1:19-cv-01216-CRC, 1:19-cv-01363-CRC, 1:19-cv-01366-CRC, 1:19-cv-01445-CRC, 1:19-cv-01600-CRC(lccrc1)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #10 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and said pleading was filed in the correct case. (ztd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC et al.(Orloff, Serena) Modified on 6/13/2019 (ztd).
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC, 1:19-cv-01445-CRC(Orloff, Serena)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has before it fifteen cases that have been consolidated and stayed pending the Supreme Court's decision on the merits in Azar v. Allina Health Services, No. 17-1484. The Court directed the parties to file a joint status report within thirty (30) days of the Supreme Court's decision in that case. The Supreme Court issued its decision in Allina Health Services on June 3, 2019. So that it does not receive fifteen separate status reports, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a single consolidated joint status report reflecting the views of all plaintiffs in the consolidated case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/6/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00222-CRC, 1:18-cv-01248-CRC, 1:18-cv-01385-CRC, 1:18-cv-01613-CRC, 1:18-cv-02171-CRC, 1:19-cv-00670-CRC, 1:19-cv-01008-CRC, 1:19-cv-01104-CRC, 1:19-cv-01181-CRC, 1:19-cv-01216-CRC, 1:19-cv-01363-CRC, 1:19-cv-01366-CRC, 1:19-cv-01445-CRC(lccrc1)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 5/29/2019 (Marcus, Kenneth)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/29/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/24/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/23/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 21, 2019 Cases Consolidated. Case 19cv1445 CRC and 18cv222 have been consolidated pursuant to Minute Order of 5/21/19. All future filings in these cases shall be made on the docket of case Lead Case 18-cv-222. Parties are advised NOT to select the Spread Text option as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (ztd)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case, 19-cv-1445, is hereby CONSOLIDATED with case 18-cv-222 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). All future filings in these cases shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. It is further ORDERED that the consolidated case will remain stayed. The parties shall file a joint status report within thirty days of the Supreme Court's decision on the merits in Azar v. Allina Health Services (No. 17-1484). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/21/2019. (lccrc1)
May 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zrdj)
May 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II filed by CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL, BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, PARKLAND HEALTH CENTER-FARMINGTON, BOONE HOSPITAL CENTER, ALTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Comparison Of Complaint)(Marcus, Kenneth)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-2171. (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, BOONE HOSPITAL CENTER, CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL, PARKLAND HEALTH CENTER-FARMINGTON (Marcus, Kenneth)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6131952) filed by CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL, BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, PARKLAND HEALTH CENTER-FARMINGTON, BOONE HOSPITAL CENTER, ALTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Summons Secretary of Health and Human Services, #4 Summons Attorney General Of The United States, #5 Summons United States Atttorney)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARKLAND HEALTH CENTER-FARMINGTON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOONE HOSPITAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL NORTHWEST ARKANSAS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL ARDOMORE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL LEBANON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL INDEPENDENCE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL JOPLIN
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL WASHINGTON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SCOTT
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL SPRINGFIELD
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL OKLAHOMA CITY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHI ST. VINCENT HOT SPRINGS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL EL RENO
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL FORT SMITH
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?