COOPER v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al

Plaintiff: SAMUEL COOPER
Defendant: KARINA PHILLIP, UNNAMED OFFICERS, WILMINO PANTALEON, EDWARD D. RODRIGUEZ, BENJAMIN CELANO, MORGAN SCHIFF, JOHN LAY, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, UNNAMED METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT OFFICERS and EDWARD RODRIGUEZ
Case Number: 1:2019cv01449
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Lee Lomax on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Lomax, Emma)
July 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/12/2019. (znbn)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendants District of Columbia and Benjamin Celano shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by August 12, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/5/2019. (lcjeb2)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or other responsive pleading by BENJAMIN CELANO, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Featherstone, Kerslyn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to BENJAMIN CELANO, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, JOHN LAY, WILMINO PANTALEON, KARINA PHILLIP, EDWARD RODRIGUEZ, MORGAN SCHIFF, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6132033) filed by SAMUEL COOPER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McDaniel, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOPER v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARINA PHILLIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED OFFICERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILMINO PANTALEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD D. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN CELANO
Represented By: Kerslyn D. Featherstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORGAN SCHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN LAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Emma Lee Lomax
Represented By: Kerslyn D. Featherstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT OFFICERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL COOPER
Represented By: Brian Keith McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?