HAMADEH v. MCALEENAN

Plaintiff: MUHAMMAD HAMADEH
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01451
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Robert Healy on behalf of KEVIN K. MCALEENAN (Healy, Christopher)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN K. MCALEENAN served on 5/30/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/24/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/23/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return Service Executed, #2 Summons Return Service Executed)(Jump, Christina)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
May 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zrdj)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT SEEKING DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against KEVIN K. MCALEENAN IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS ACTING SECRETARY OF DHS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6132079) filed by MUHAMMAD HAMADEH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Requests for Summons)(Jump, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMADEH v. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUHAMMAD HAMADEH
Represented By: Christina A. Jump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Christopher Robert Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?