MALLINCKRODT ARD LLC v. VERMA et al
Plaintiff: MALLINCKRODT ARD LLC
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II and SEEMA VERMA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01471
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment by MALLINCKRODT ARD LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Catherine)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 Memorandum in opposition to re #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MALLINCKRODT ARD LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Catherine)
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by ALEX M. AZAR, II, SEEMA VERMA. (Snell, Kevin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 SEALED OPPOSITION Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, SEEMA VERMA. (ztd); (Combined Sealed Document. See docket entry no. #18 )
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT(Statement of Points and Authorities)filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, SEEMA VERMA. re #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SEEMA VERMA, ALEX M. AZAR, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
July 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file a redacted public version of its brief by 7/12/2019. (jth)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Defendant's Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal [16-2] Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. It is ORDERED that the parties shall cooperate in preparing redactions and defendants shall file a redacted public version of its brief by July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/8/19. (DMK)
July 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALEX M. AZAR, II, SEEMA VERMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, SEEMA VERMA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (on motion to seal), #2 Exhibit Sealed Statement of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)(Snell, Kevin)
July 4, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Brief Under Seal by MALLINCKRODT ARD LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Catherine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing a Certified List of Contents of Administrative Record by ALEX M. AZAR, II, SEEMA VERMA (Attachments: #1 Certified List of Contents of Administrative Record)(Snell, Kevin)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. The Administrative Record must be transmitted by June 28, 2019; the government must file its opposition to the P.I. combined with its cross-motion for summary judgment by July 5, 2019; plaintiff's opposition to the cross-motion for summary judgment combined with its reply in support of its P.I. motion is due July 15, 2019; and the government's reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment is due July 24, 2019. The Motions Hearing scheduled for July 23, 2019 is hereby VACATED and rescheduled for July 30, 2019 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 3. In light of the representations in defendants' motion, it is ORDERED that defendant will refrain from locking Mallinckrodt out until three business days after the Court has entered judgment on the merits in the case or the matter is otherwise resolved. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/7/2019. (lcabj2)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Schedule (Urgent) by ALEX M. AZAR, II, SEEMA VERMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SEEMA VERMA served on 5/28/2019 (Druding, Kyle)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 5/29/2019 (Druding, Kyle)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General May 29, 2019. (Druding, Kyle)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Judge Amy Berman Jackson, held on 5-24-2019; Page Numbers: 1 - 13. Date of Issuance: 6-03-2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Elizabeth SaintLoth; Telephone number: 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 6/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2019.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
May 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Telephone Conference Call held on 5/29/2019. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman). (jth)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Telephone Scheduling Conference call held on 5/24/2019. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a)(2), and with the consent of the parties, the Court will consolidate the motion for a preliminary injunction ("PI") with the merits. The Court hereby adopts the parties' proposed schedule: the Administrative Record must be transmitted by June 7, 2019; the government must file its opposition to the P.I. combined with its cross-motion for summary judgment by June 14, 2019; plaintiff's opposition to the cross-motion for summary judgment combined with its reply in support of its P.I. motion is due June 24, 2019; the government's reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment is due July 3, 2019. The Court will hold a hearing on the motions on July 23, 2019 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 3. Defendant is excused from filing an answer to the complaint while these motions are pending. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference on May 29, 2019 at 10:00 am. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth) (jth)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Matthew Snell on behalf of All Defendants (Snell, Kevin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/22/2019. (Stetson, Catherine)
May 23, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: An on the record Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 5/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The parties will be notified, in a separate email, by the Court's Deputy Clerk of both the toll free dial in telephone number and pass code to allow them access to the call. (jth)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Mitchell Druding on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ARD LLC (Druding, Kyle)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, SEEMA VERMA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
May 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MALLINCKRODT ARD LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Notice to Counsel/Party, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stetson, Catherine)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Margaret Cook on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ARD LLC (Cook, Susan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MALLINCKRODT ARD LLC (Stetson, Catherine)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, SEEMA VERMA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6135346) filed by MALLINCKRODT ARD LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Barr, #3 Summons Verma, #4 Summons Azar, #5 Summons Liu, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12)(Stetson, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALLINCKRODT ARD LLC v. VERMA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEEMA VERMA
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALLINCKRODT ARD LLC
Represented By: Susan Margaret Cook
Represented By: Catherine Emily Stetson
Represented By: Kyle Mitchell Druding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?