TRIVEDI v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MADHURI TRIVEDI
Defendant: GE HEALTHCARE, GE BOARD OF DIRECTORS, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY and LARRY CULP
Case Number: 1:2019cv01479
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by MADHURI TRIVEDI (jf)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a #19 Motion to Compel and for Order to Show Cause, a #21 Motion to Reconsider, and a #20 Supplemental Response to the Court's #12 Order to Show Cause. The Court addresses each in turn. First, as to Plaintiff's motion to compel and for a show-cause order, discovery has not yet commenced in this action, and thus Plaintiff's protestation that Defendants have not complied with their initial disclosure requirements is premature. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C) (explaining that initial disclosures are to be made no later than ten days after the parties' Rule 26(f) conference). Accordingly, Plaintiff's #19 Motion to Compel and for Order to Show Cause is DENIED. Second, the Court has already denied Plaintiff's request for a CM/ECF user name and password, and it sees no reason to revisit that decision now. Plaintiff's #21 Motion to Reconsider is therefore DENIED. Finally, upon consideration of the parties' responses to the Court's #12 Order to show cause why the case should not be transferred to a more appropriate venue, the Court determined to take no action. If Plaintiff now believes that venue is more appropriate elsewhere, she may either voluntarily dismiss this action under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and refile her complaint in a different district, or file a motion with this Court requesting that it transfer the case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and demonstrating that the requisite factors to warrant transfer are met. Absent voluntary dismissal, however, nothing in this Order relieves Plaintiff of her obligation to respond to Defendants' #17 Motion to Dismiss by August 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/9/2019. (lctjk2)
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Reconsideration, by MADHURI TRIVEDI (Attachment: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (tth)
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #12 Order to Show Cause filed by MADHURI TRIVEDI. (tth)
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Order to Show Cause by MADHURI TRIVEDI (Attachment: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (tth)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's #13 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff has moved for reconsideration of the Court's denial of her request for CM/ECF access. Yet her conduct thus far in the litigation, including her repeated attempts to contact Chambers and the Courtroom Deputy to discuss substantive matters about her case, does not bode favorably for her use of this Court's electronic filing system. Accordingly, the Court finds, in its discretion, that Plaintiff should not be provided a CM/ECF user name and password for this case, and Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is therefore DENIED. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/5/2019. (lctjk2)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' #17 Motion to Dismiss by August 30, 2019, or risk dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/30/2019. (lctjk2) (Main Document 18 replaced on 7/30/2019 to correct case number) (zkh).
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by LARRY CULP, GE BOARD OF DIRECTORS, GE HEALTHCARE, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Matt Graves, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Graves, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GE HEALTHCARE, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Graves, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by LARRY CULP, GE BOARD OF DIRECTORS, GE HEALTHCARE, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re #12 Order to Show Cause . (Graves, Matthew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by MADHURI TRIVEDI re #12 Order to Show Cause. (tth)
June 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response due by 7/3/2019. (kh)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff's response due 6/26/2019. Defendants' response due 7/3/2019. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/17/2019. (lctjk2)
June 13, 2019 Payment for #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tomasita Sherer, :Firm- DLA Piper LLP (US), :Address- 1251 Avenue of the Americas, 27th Floor, New York, NY 10020-1104. Phone No. - 212.335.4579. Fax No. - 917.778.8612 $100. ($100; Receipt number 0090-6185634). (Graves, Matthew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password, by MADHURI TRIVEDI. (Attachment: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (tth)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against LARRY CULP, GE BOARD OF DIRECTORS, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GE HEALTHCARE with Jury Demand filed by MADHURI TRIVEDI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jf); Modified text to add Defendant GE HEALTHCARE on 6/19/2019 (tth).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of two letters from Plaintiff in which she seeks to "amend" or "clarify" her complaint. The Court denied leave to file those letters. If Plaintiff wishes to amend her complaint to incorporate new allegations, she may do so by filing an amended pleading that includes those new allegations; she should not seek to modify her complaint through correspondence with the Court. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/12/2019. (lctjk2)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED - Letter. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED". Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/11/2019. (tth)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED - Letter. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED". Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/11/2019. (tth)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court acknowledges that Plaintiff opposes this motion, but Plaintiff's representations regarding her interactions with the attorney seeking admission are not grounds to deny admission under LCvR 83.2(d). Because Defendants' motion satisfies the requirements of that rule, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Attorney Tomasita Sherer is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/11/2019. (lctjk2)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants seek an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint, citing the length of the complaint, including the number of counts brought and the voluminous attachments. While Plaintiff's response does not make clear whether she actually opposes this request, to the extent that she does oppose it, she does not explain why Defendants have not demonstrated the requisite good cause under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint no later than July 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/11/2019. (lctjk2)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's #3 Motion for CM/ECF Password. Plaintiff has not demonstrated that she meets the requirements of LCvR 5.4(b)(2). Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/11/2019. (lctjk2)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Pro Se Complaint filed by MADHURI TRIVEDI. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (tth)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tomasita Sherer, :Firm- DLA Piper LLP (US), :Address- 1251 Avenue of the Americas, 27th Floor, New York, NY 10020-1104. Phone No. - 212.335.4579. Fax No. - 917.778.8612 $100 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by LARRY CULP, GE BOARD OF DIRECTORS, GE HEALTHCARE, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Tomasita Sherer, #2 Exhibit B -- Trivedi Opposition, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Graves, Matthew)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Pro Se Complaint by LARRY CULP, GE BOARD OF DIRECTORS, GE HEALTHCARE, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Graves, Matthew)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LARRY CULP served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019; GE BOARD OF DIRECTORS served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019; GE HEALTHCARE served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (See Docket Entry #4 to view document) (tth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (tth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by MADHURI TRIVEDI. (tth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Michael Graves on behalf of All Defendants (Graves, Matthew)
May 21, 2019 Summons (1) Issued as to GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (tth)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LARRY CULP, GE BOARD OF DIRECTORS, GE HEALTHCARE, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616098150) with Jury Demand filed by MADHURI TRIVEDI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 28, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRIVEDI v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Matthew Michael Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE BOARD OF DIRECTORS
Represented By: Tomasita Sherer
Represented By: Matthew Michael Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Tomasita Sherer
Represented By: Matthew Michael Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY CULP
Represented By: Tomasita Sherer
Represented By: Matthew Michael Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MADHURI TRIVEDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?