JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC. v. UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION
Plaintiff: JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01494
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 7/24/2019; Answer due by 8/7/2019. (kt)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendant's Partially-Opposed Motion for Voluntary Remand, Dkt. 15, the Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file a response on or before July 24, 2019. In light of this ORDER, the Defendant's unopposed motion to extend time to file an answer or motion is GRANTED in part. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before August 7, 2019, unless the matter is remanded before that date or the Court grants a further extension of time to answer or move. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 07/17/2019. (lcrdm2, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to United States International Trade Commission , MOTION to Stay , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Morad, Houda)
July 11, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/25/2019, at 3:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, Dkt. 3, and motion to seal, Dkt. 4, are both GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on July 25, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/10/2019. (lcrdm2, )
June 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2019 re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC., and #4 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC. filed by JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC. MATTERS TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC.. (Hoffman, Jason)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Morad, Houda)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION served on 5/24/2019 (Hoffman, Jason)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/28/2019. (lcrdm2, )
May 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Opposition due by 6/10/2019; Reply due by 6/14/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2019, at 3:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that Defendant shall file an opposition to the motion for preliminary injunction, Dkt. 3, on or before June 10, 2019 and Plaintiff shall file a reply brief on or before June 14. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a motions hearing at 3:00 p.m. on June 21, 2019 in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/24/2019. (lcrdm2, )
May 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 5/24/2019. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sidney A. Rosenzweig on behalf of UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION (Rosenzweig, Sidney)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Morad, Houda)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
May 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zeg)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 ERRATA to Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC.. (Hoffman, Jason)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Houda Morad on behalf of UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION (Morad, Houda)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Confidential Exhibit A, #2 Confidential Exhibit B, #3 Confidential Exhibit C, #4 Confidential Exhibit D, #5 Confidential Exhibit E, #6 Declaration of Jason F. Hoffman, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Jason)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jason F. Hoffman, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Jason)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC. (Hoffman, Jason)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT -- VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6140552) filed by JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - May 6, 2019 Notice of Commission, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Hoffman, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC. v. UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By: Houda Morad
Represented By: Sidney A. Rosenzweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUBILANT DRAXIMAGE INC.
Represented By: Jason F. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?