PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY v. PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP et al
Plaintiff: Platte River Insurance Company
Defendant: Lamar Toland, Derrick S Sieber, Precision Contracting Solutions LP, Catherine L Miller, PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP, DERRICK S. SIEBER and CATHERINE L. MILLER
Case Number: 1:2019cv01556
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Alexander Kahn) by PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Alexander)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Peter Williams on behalf of PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY (Williams, Joel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay, #11 MOTION for Leave to File filed by PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lyle, Edward)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay filed by PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration)(Lyle, Edward) Modified event title on 7/10/2019 (znmw).
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay filed by PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Alexander)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Alexander)
July 1, 2019 Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Rudolph Contreras is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LAMAR TOLAND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vogel, Kenneth)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case by LAMAR TOLAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vogel, Kenneth); Modified event and text on 6/26/2019 (tth). Added MOTION to Stay on 6/26/2019 (tth).
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyle, Edward)
June 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Alan Vogel on behalf of LAMAR TOLAND (Vogel, Kenneth)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CATHERINE L. MILLER served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; DERRICK S. SIEBER served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; LAMAR TOLAND served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019 (Kahn, Alexander)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to CATHERINE L. MILLER, PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP, DERRICK S. SIEBER, LAMAR TOLAND. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Platte River Insurance Company (Kahn, Alexander)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in the nature of interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6148105) filed by Platte River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sieber, #3 Summons Precision, #4 Summons Miller, #5 Summons Toland, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G)(Kahn, Alexander) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/31/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY v. PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Platte River Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexander B. Kahn
Represented By: Joel Peter Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar Toland
Represented By: Kenneth Alan Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick S Sieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Contracting Solutions LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRECISION CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, LP
Represented By: Edward West Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DERRICK S. SIEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHERINE L. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?