CORSI et al v. CAPUTO et al
Plaintiff: LARRY E. KLAYMAN and JEROME CORSI
Defendant: ROGER JASON STONE, JR., MICHAEL CAPUTO and ROGER STONE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01573
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #15 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to sleckar@kalbianhagerty.com, cc'd 9 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. In future, ECF login must match attorney signature on document; Do not refile. (znmw, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to opposition to motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MICHAEL CAPUTO. (Leckar, Stephen)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JEROME CORSI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Klayman, Larry)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff Larry Klayman's #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Plaintiff Klayman as a party to this action. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/3/2019. (lctjk1)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Larry Klayman (Klayman, Larry)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendant Caputo's #5 Motion to Dismiss by July 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/21/2019. (lctjk1)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to #5 Defendant Michael Caputo's Motion to Dismiss and Proposed Order by JEROME CORSI, LARRY E. KLAYMAN (Klayman, Larry); Modified on 6/21/2019 to add docket entry relationship (tth).
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Discovery by ROGER STONE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Routman, Chandler)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 19 CA 002226 B . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Routman, Chandler); Modified text and docket relationship at the request of counsel on 6/21/2019 (tth).
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant Roger Stone's #1 Motion to Dismiss filed by JEROME CORSI, LARRY E. KLAYMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Klayman, Larry); Modified to add docket entry relationship on 6/13/2019 (tth).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant Caputo's #7 #8 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Dennis C. Vacco and Scott S. Allen, Jr., are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/7/2019. (lctjk1)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Scott S. Allen, Jr., :Firm- Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP, :Address- 50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1700, Buffalo, NY 14202. Phone No. - 716-853-5100. Fax No. - 716-853-5199 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6174034. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MICHAEL CAPUTO (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Leckar, Stephen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dennis C. Vacco, :Firm- Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP, :Address- 50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1700, Buffalo, NY 14202. Phone No. - 716-853-5100. Fax No. - 716-853-5199 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6173943. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MICHAEL CAPUTO (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Leckar, Stephen)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Craig Leckar on behalf of MICHAEL CAPUTO (Leckar, Stephen)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal), MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by MICHAEL CAPUTO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Leckar, Stephen)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #3 Notice of Related Case, #1 Notice of Removal. (zef, )
June 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ROGER STONE. Case related to Case No. 19cv324-TJK. (zef, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Buschel on behalf of ROGER JASON STONE, JR (Buschel, Robert)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 19 CA 002226 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6151006 filed by ROGER JASON STONE, JR. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Counsel/Party Notice of Related Case, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Superior Court Documents Superior Court Docket, #4 Superior Court Documents Initial Filing by Plaintiff, #5 Superior Court Documents Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed 5/28/19)(Routman, Chandler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORSI et al v. CAPUTO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER JASON STONE, JR.
Represented By: Chandler Paige Routman
Represented By: Robert C. Buschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CAPUTO
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Craig Leckar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER STONE
Represented By: Chandler Paige Routman
Represented By: Robert C. Buschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY E. KLAYMAN
Represented By: Larry E. Klayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROME CORSI
Represented By: Larry E. Klayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?