FAHEY v. S.C. JOHNSON & SON INC.
Plaintiff: A. KEVIN FAHEY
Defendant: S.C. JOHNSON & SON INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01587
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice #6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is dismissed with prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees in connection with the case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/10/2019. (lcrdm3, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal with PREJUDICE by S.C. JOHNSON & SON INC.. (Mundel, Benjamin)
June 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/8/2019. (kt)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion for extension of time #3 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before July 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/4/2019. (lcrdm3, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/4/2019. (lcrdm3, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (zef, )
June 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on July 8th, 2019 by S.C. JOHNSON & SON INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mundel, Benjamin)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by S.C. JOHNSON & SON INC. (Mundel, Benjamin)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, case number 2019 CA 002888 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6155053 filed by S.C. JOHNSON & SON INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Docket Sheet, Complaint, & Summons), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mundel, Benjamin) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/4/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAHEY v. S.C. JOHNSON & SON INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. KEVIN FAHEY
Represented By: Thomas C. Willcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.C. JOHNSON & SON INC.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Mundel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?