WATSON et al v. PERDUE et al
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Watson, Deborah Watson, Troy Watson, Rhonda Watson and WAYNE WATSON
Defendant: Sonny Perdue and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01633
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Supplemental Brief due by 8/9/2019. Plaintiffs' Response due by 8/16/2019. Defendant's Reply due by 8/23/2019. (hmc)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The parties are directed to file supplemental briefing to address the issues identified in the attached Order. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 07/26/2019. (lctnm2)
July 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Case called for Status Conference, but not held. Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2019 re #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones.) (hmc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DEBORAH WATSON, FITZGERALD WATSON, RHONDA WATSON, TROY WATSON, WAYNE WATSON. (Robinson, Paul) Modified event title and link on 7/12/2019 (znmw).
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum in opposition to re #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SONNY PERDUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration William Miller, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit J1, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X)(Campbell, Rhonda)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DEBORAH WATSON, FITZGERALD WATSON, RHONDA WATSON, TROY WATSON, WAYNE WATSON (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Notice of Sale)(Robinson, Paul). Added MOTION to Convert Hearing on 7/1/2019 (znmw).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/25/19 nun pro tunc to 6/24/19. (lctnm2)
June 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Plaintiffs' #7 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, HEARD and GRANTED. Status Conference set for 7/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Plaintiffs' motion to convert Status Conference into Preliminary Injunction Hearing due by the end of the week. Defendants' opposition or declaration due by 7/8/2019. Plaintiffs' reply due by noon on 7/12/2019. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller.) (hmc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of All Defendants (Campbell, Rhonda)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #14 Notice (Other); emailed to problaw937@hotmail.com, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Pleade do not refile. In future, exhibits must be accompanied by a Notice of Filing. (ztth, )
June 22, 2019 Filing 14 ERRATA for TRO Memorandum Exhibits I and O by DEBORAH WATSON, FITZGERALD WATSON, RHONDA WATSON, TROY WATSON, WAYNE WATSON re #7 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Robinson, Paul); Modified event and text on 6/24/2019 (tth).
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Hearing filed by DEBORAH WATSON, FITZGERALD WATSON, RHONDA WATSON, TROY WATSON, WAYNE WATSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wind Down Stipulation Order)(Robinson, Paul)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Hearing filed by SONNY PERDUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Campbell, Rhonda)
June 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order due by 6/19/2019. Plaintiffs' reply due by 6/21/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a motion hearing regarding #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order on June 24, 2019 at 11 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The Defendants shall file an Opposition to the Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order on or before June 19, 2019, and the Plaintiff may file a Reply to that Opposition on or before June 21, 2019 at noon. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/12/19. (lctnm1)
June 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephone Conference held on 6/12/2019. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller.) (hmc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of SONNY PERDUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Campbell, Rhonda)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/6/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/5/2019. (Robinson, Paul)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 6/6/2019 (Robinson, Paul)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06-05-2019. (Robinson, Paul)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DEBORAH WATSON, FITZGERALD WATSON, RHONDA WATSON, TROY WATSON, WAYNE WATSON (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Robinson, Paul). Added MOTION for Hearing on 6/12/2019 (tth).
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Errata, residence address of Plaintiff added by DEBORAH WATSON, FITZGERALD WATSON, RHONDA WATSON, TROY WATSON, WAYNE WATSON re #1 Complaint, (Robinson, Paul)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SONNY PERDUE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/5/19. (lctnm1)
June 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Exhibits L-Q by WAYNE WATSON, Deborah Watson, Fitzgerald Watson, Rhonda Watson, Troy Watson re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit P-Q)(Robinson, Paul)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Exhibits to complaint E- K by WAYNE WATSON, Deborah Watson, Fitzgerald Watson, Rhonda Watson, Troy Watson re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit Exhibits F-K)(Robinson, Paul)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6165177) filed by Fitzgerald Watson, WAYNE WATSON, Rhonda Watson, Troy Watson, Deborah Watson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Robinson, Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/5/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATSON et al v. PERDUE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Perdue
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Watson
Represented By: Paul A. Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Watson
Represented By: Paul A. Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Watson
Represented By: Paul A. Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Watson
Represented By: Paul A. Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE WATSON
Represented By: Paul A. Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?