BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE CO. et al v. ANAND et al
Plaintiff: BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE CO., PACIFIC INDEMNITY CO. and GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE CO.
Defendant: ASHA ANAND and VINOD ANAND
Case Number: 1:2019cv01661
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEET & CONFER ORDER. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/26/2019. (lcrcl3)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by ASHA ANAND, VINOD ANAND.(Stewart, Alicia)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/23/2019. (lcrcl3)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/02/2019. (lcrcl3)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/02/2019. (lcrcl3)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig David Roswell on behalf of ASHA ANAND, VINOD ANAND (Roswell, Craig)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleadings by ASHA ANAND, VINOD ANAND re #1 Complaint, (Stewart, Alicia) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct docket event/text (jf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Dawn Stewart on behalf of ASHA ANAND, VINOD ANAND (Stewart, Alicia)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ASHA ANAND served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 (Kurtz, Chad)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. VINOD ANAND served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 (Kurtz, Chad)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael D. O'Donnell, :Firm- Cozen O'Connor P.C., :Address- 1650 Market Street, Suite 2800, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Phone No. - (215) 665-2000. Fax No. - (215) 665-2013 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6188480. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE CO., GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE CO., PACIFIC INDEMNITY CO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Chad)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kevin J. Hughes, :Firm- Cozen O'Connor P.C., :Address- 1650 Market Street, Suite 2800, Philadelphia, PA 19103. Phone No. - (215) 665-2000. Fax No. - (215) 701-2439 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6188427. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE CO., GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE CO., PACIFIC INDEMNITY CO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Chad)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ASHA ANAND, VINOD ANAND. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE CO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kurtz, Chad)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PACIFIC INDEMNITY CO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kurtz, Chad)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE CO. (Kurtz, Chad)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6171388) filed by BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE CO., GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE CO., PACIFIC INDEMNITY CO.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Vinod Anand, #3 Summons Asha Anand)(Kurtz, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE CO. et al v. ANAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANKERS STANDARD INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Chad E. Kurtz
Represented By: Michael D. O'Donnell
Represented By: Kevin J. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFIC INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By: Chad E. Kurtz
Represented By: Michael D. O'Donnell
Represented By: Kevin J. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Chad E. Kurtz
Represented By: Michael D. O'Donnell
Represented By: Kevin J. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHA ANAND
Represented By: Alicia Dawn Stewart
Represented By: Craig David Roswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINOD ANAND
Represented By: Alicia Dawn Stewart
Represented By: Craig David Roswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?