FEW v. LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2
Plaintiff: EDWARD FEW
Defendant: LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION AND DISABILITY FUND NO. 2 and LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2
Case Number: 1:2019cv01669
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 6/27/2019. (zjd)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by June 27, 2019, to Defendant Laborers District Council Pension & Disability Trust Fund No. 2's #7 Motion to Dismiss or risk dismissal of the case. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/17/2019. (lcapm1)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ERRATA by LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2 #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Corrected Affidavit of R. Renee Parenti)(Leins, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of R. Renee Parenti, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Leins, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon McNeilly Goodman on behalf of LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2 (Goodman, Sharon)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Leins on behalf of LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2 (Leins, Christopher)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Errata, #3 Cover Sheet. (zef, )
June 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, )
June 10, 2019 Payment for #1 Notice of Removal,. ($400; Receipt number 0090-6176872). (Leins, Christopher)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2.(Leins, Christopher) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/11/2019) (zef, ).
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA Corrected Notice of Removal by LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2 #1 Notice of Removal, filed by LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Leins, Christopher)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 19-0003085 (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION AND DISABILITY FUND NO. 2. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Defendant's Process, Pleadings and Orders, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal Superior Court of District of Columbia)(Leins, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/19/2019) (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEW v. LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD FEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION AND DISABILITY FUND NO. 2
Represented By: Christopher M. Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORERS DISTRICT COUNCIL PENSION & DISABILITY TRUST FUND NO. 2
Represented By: Christopher M. Leins
Represented By: Sharon McNeilly Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?