IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND et al v. FOOD SERVICES INC. OF GAINESVILLE
Plaintiff: PHILIP J. GRUBER, IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND and HENRY C. EICKELBERG
Defendant: FOOD SERVICES INC. OF GAINESVILLE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01681
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer or response to the Plaintiff's Complaint due by 8/30/2019. (hmc)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before August 30, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/5/2019. (lctnm1)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by HENRY C. EICKELBERG, PHILIP J. GRUBER, IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiffrin, Joshua)
July 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 8/6/2019. (hmc)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before August 6, 2019. The parties are reminded to strictly comply with the directives in the Court's #3 Standing Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/16/19. (lcntm1)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by HENRY C. EICKELBERG, PHILIP J. GRUBER, IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiffrin, Joshua)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FOOD SERVICES INC. OF GAINESVILLE served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019 (Shiffrin, Joshua)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/11/19. (lctnm1)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FOOD SERVICES INC. OF GAINESVILLE. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FOOD SERVICES INC. OF GAINESVILLE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6176881) filed by IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND, HENRY C. EICKELBERG, PHILIP J. GRUBER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Shiffrin, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND et al v. FOOD SERVICES INC. OF GAINESVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP J. GRUBER
Represented By: Joshua Barnett Shiffrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND
Represented By: Joshua Barnett Shiffrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY C. EICKELBERG
Represented By: Joshua Barnett Shiffrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOOD SERVICES INC. OF GAINESVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?