IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND et al v. MONDELEZ GLOBAL LLC
Plaintiff: PHILIP J. GRUBER, IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND and HENRY C. EICKELBERG
Defendant: MONDELEZ GLOBAL LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01682
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/30/2019. (tj)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 motion for extension of time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including August 30, 2019 to file its answer or other response to Plaintiffs' complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/30/19. (lcrc1)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Additional Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MONDELEZ GLOBAL LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bergeson, Meredith)
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/1/2019. (tj)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 motion for extension of time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its answer, motion, or other response to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before August 1, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/1/19. (lcrc1)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MONDELEZ GLOBAL LLC (Bergeson, Meredith)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MONDELEZ GLOBAL LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bergeson, Meredith)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MONDELEZ GLOBAL LLC served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019 (Shiffrin, Joshua)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to MONDELEZ GLOBAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONDELEZ GLOBAL LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6176931) filed by IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND, HENRY C. EICKELBERG, PHILIP J. GRUBER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Shiffrin, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND et al v. MONDELEZ GLOBAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONDELEZ GLOBAL LLC
Represented By: Meredith Renee Fleming Bergeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP J. GRUBER
Represented By: Joshua Barnett Shiffrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND
Represented By: Joshua Barnett Shiffrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY C. EICKELBERG
Represented By: Joshua Barnett Shiffrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?