WARE EL v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff: ROBERT D. WARE EL
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01684
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: G Michael Harvey
Referring Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 06/14/2019. (lctnm2)
June 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmc)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/11/2019. (zmc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by ROBERT D. WARE EL. (zmc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT D. WARE EL (zmc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION filed by ROBERT D. WARE EL.(zmc)
June 6, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 06/06/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARE EL v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT D. WARE EL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?