SOUVANNASOT v. HARVEY et al
Plaintiff: NIYOM SOUVANNASOT
Defendant: EDWARD ELMHURST HOSPITAL, Dr. ELIZABETH HARVEY and ELIZABETH HARVEY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01688
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Reconsideration; denying #5 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/30/2019. (zsb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 Memorandum & Opinion, #4 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case,, MOTION to Reopen Case by NIYOM SOUVANNASOT (zsb)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/21/2019. (zmc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/21/2019. (zmc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by NIYOM SOUVANNASOT (zmc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EDWARD ELMHURST HOSPITAL, ELIZABETH HARVEY filed by NIYOM SOUVANNASOT. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zmc) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/12/2019) (zmc).
June 5, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 06/05/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUVANNASOT v. HARVEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD ELMHURST HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. ELIZABETH HARVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH HARVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIYOM SOUVANNASOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?