GOSSELIN, et al. v. FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION et al
Plaintiff: ACOAXET MICMAC TRIBE and RICHER GOSSELIN
Defendant: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, SETERUS and COOPER
Case Number: 1:2019cv01695
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/26/2019 (tj)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond, on or before August 26, 2019, to #7 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or the Court may deem the motion conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 25, 2019. (lcrc3)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by COOPER, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, SETERUS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Hutson, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/24/2019. (tj)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #5 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that #5 the Motion is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until and including July 24, 2019 to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 18, 2019. (lcrc3)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COOPER served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; SETERUS served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (tth)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by COOPER, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, SETERUS (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hutson, Elizabeth)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COOPER, SETERUS (Hutson, Elizabeth)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Hutson, Elizabeth)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Hutson on behalf of COOPER, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, SETERUS (Hutson, Elizabeth)
June 11, 2019 Summons (3) Issued as to COOPER, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, SETERUS. (tth)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COOPER, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, SETERUS (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616098751) with Jury Demand filed by ACOAXET MICMAC TRIBE, RICHER GOSSELIN. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOSSELIN, et al. v. FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETERUS
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACOAXET MICMAC TRIBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHER GOSSELIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?