PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Plaintiff: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Case Number: 1:2019cv01698
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2019. (zjd)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before September 30, 2019, which updates the court on the agency's search and production efforts. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/05/2019. (lcapm1)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Valdivia, Diana)
July 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2019. (zjd)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before August 1, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Please see the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/18/2019. (lcapm2)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Valdivia, Diana)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Valdivia, Diana)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (zef, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6180087) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 Summons agency summons, #3 Summons AG summons, #4 Summons USAO DC Summons, #5 Declaration 7.1 disclosure)(Jenkins, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/11/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Diana Viggiano Valdivia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Represented By: Peter T. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?