CHESTER v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: ANDY CHESTER
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2019cv01719
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:2
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7-29-2019. (lcckk3)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(Engel, Jason)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019 (Duckworth, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (jf)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/17/19. (DM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ANDY CHESTER.(Duckworth, James)
June 13, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (zef, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA re #1 COMPLAINT Errata against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6186205) filed by ANDY CHESTER. (Attachments: #1 Errata Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Errata Summons)(Duckworth, James) Modified event title on 6/26/2019 (znmw).
June 13, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (zef, )
June 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6184166) filed by ANDY CHESTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Duckworth, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/13/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHESTER v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDY CHESTER
Represented By: James M. Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Jason R. Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?