AMERICAN GREAT LAKES PORTS ASSOCIATION et al v. SCHULTZ et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES GREAT LAKES SHIPPING ASSOCIATION, POLSKA ZEGLUGA MORSKA P.P., BROCHART KB, FEDNAV INTERNATIONAL LTD., CANFORNAV INC., WAGENBORG SHIPPING BV, SHIPPING FEDERATION OF CANADA, AMERICAN GREAT LAKES PORTS ASSOCIATION and SPLIETHOFF TRANSPORT BV
Defendant: KARL SCHULTZ and UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
Case Number: 1:2019cv01723
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Referring Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by SHIPPING FEDERATION OF CANADA, CANFORNAV INC., UNITED STATES GREAT LAKES SHIPPING ASSOCIATION, BROCHART KB, WAGENBORG SHIPPING BV, AMERICAN GREAT LAKES PORTS ASSOCIATION, FEDNAV INTERNATIONAL LTD., POLSKA ZEGLUGA MORSKA P.P., SPLIETHOFF TRANSPORT BV. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended Corporate Disclosure)(Benner, Charles) Modified to add filer on 7/5/2019 (ztd).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/17/19. (DM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to KARL SCHULTZ, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMERICAN GREAT LAKES PORTS ASSOCIATION, BROCHART KB, CANFORNAV INC., FEDNAV INTERNATIONAL LTD., POLSKA ZEGLUGA MORSKA P.P., SHIPPING FEDERATION OF CANADA, UNITED STATES GREAT LAKES SHIPPING ASSOCIATION, WAGENBORG SHIPPING BV. Case related to Case No. 18cv2650 (CRC). (zef, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN GREAT LAKES PORTS ASSOCIATION, BROCHART KB, CANFORNAV INC., FEDNAV INTERNATIONAL LTD., POLSKA ZEGLUGA MORSKA P.P., SHIPPING FEDERATION OF CANADA, UNITED STATES GREAT LAKES SHIPPING ASSOCIATION, WAGENBORG SHIPPING BV (zef, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6185866) filed by SHIPPING FEDERATION OF CANADA, CANFORNAV INC., UNITED STATES GREAT LAKES SHIPPING ASSOCIATION, BROCHART KB, WAGENBORG SHIPPING BV, AMERICAN GREAT LAKES PORTS ASSOCIATION, FEDNAV INTERNATIONAL LTD., POLSKA ZEGLUGA MORSKA P.P.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Corporate Disclosure, #3 Declaration Related Case Form, #4 Summons Admiral Schultz, #5 Summons DOJ, #6 Summons USAO, #7 Summons USCG)(Benner, Charles) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (zef, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/13/2019) (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN GREAT LAKES PORTS ASSOCIATION et al v. SCHULTZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES GREAT LAKES SHIPPING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Charles Jonathan Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POLSKA ZEGLUGA MORSKA P.P.
Represented By: Charles Jonathan Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROCHART KB
Represented By: Charles Jonathan Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDNAV INTERNATIONAL LTD.
Represented By: Charles Jonathan Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANFORNAV INC.
Represented By: Charles Jonathan Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAGENBORG SHIPPING BV
Represented By: Charles Jonathan Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIPPING FEDERATION OF CANADA
Represented By: Charles Jonathan Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN GREAT LAKES PORTS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Charles Jonathan Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPLIETHOFF TRANSPORT BV
Represented By: Charles Jonathan Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARL SCHULTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?