BUCHOLZ v. MNUCHIN et al
Plaintiff: JAMES S. BUCHOLZ
Defendant: CHARLES RETTIG, DARRYL J. JENKINS, UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, TONYA R. WILLIAMS-WALLACE and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01730
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must file an answer or other response to the complaint by September 20, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/12/2019. (lcabj3)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by DARRYL J. JENKINS, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, CHARLES RETTIG, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, TONYA R. WILLIAMS-WALLACE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Kyle)
June 19, 2019 CORRECTED SUMMONS REISSUED (8) as to DARRYL J. JENKINS, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, CHARLES RETTIG, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, TONYA R. WILLIAMS-WALLACE, U.S. Attorney OR U.S. Attorney General (zeg).
June 14, 2019 SUMMONS (8) Issued as to DARRYL J. JENKINS, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, CHARLES RETTIG, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, TONYA R. WILLIAMS-WALLACE, U.S. Attorney OR U.S. Attorney General (jf)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DARRYL J. JENKINS, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, CHARLES RETTIG, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, TONYA R. WILLIAMS-WALLACE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616098956) filed by JAMES S. BUCHOLZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUCHOLZ v. MNUCHIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES RETTIG
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARRYL J. JENKINS
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN T. MNUCHIN
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONYA R. WILLIAMS-WALLACE
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES S. BUCHOLZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?