FARMER v. DISABILITY PROGRAM MANAGER et al
Plaintiff: DEE DEIDRE FARMER
Defendant: DISABILITY PROGRAM MANAGER and ERIC EARWIN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01731
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Prison Condition (Other)
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer or response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 9/13/2019. (hmc)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/6/2019. (lctnm1)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by DISABILITY PROGRAM MANAGER, ERIC EARWIN (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
June 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' answer or response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 8/13/2019. (hmc)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or other respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 13, 2019. Parties are reminded to strictly comply with the Court's #4 Standing Order, including provisions about seeking extensions of time. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/19/19. (lctnm1)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by DISABILITY PROGRAM MANAGER, ERIC EARWIN (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/14/2019. (lctnm3)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (zef, )
June 14, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (zef, ).
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #2 Notice to Counsel/Party was entered in error; Corrected Notice will be filed. (zef, )
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Case Assigned/Reassigned was entered in error incorrect deck was selected during assignment. Case will be randomly assigned. (zef, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (zef, ) Modified on 6/14/2019 (zef, ).
June 14, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zef, ) Modified on 6/14/2019 (zef, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 003048 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by ERIC EARWIN, DISABILITY PROGRAM MANAGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adebonojo, Kenneth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FARMER v. DISABILITY PROGRAM MANAGER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEE DEIDRE FARMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISABILITY PROGRAM MANAGER
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC EARWIN
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?