ZAKI v. POMPEO
Plaintiff: AZZA ZAKI
Defendant: US DEPARTMENT OF STATE and MICHAEL R POMPEO
Case Number: 1:2019cv01735
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #4 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to morris@mfischerlaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Please do not refile. In future, the ECF login and signature must match. (ztth, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL R POMPEO served on 6/24/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/24/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/24/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Fischer, Morris)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by AZZA ZAKI #1 Complaint, filed by AZZA ZAKI. (Fischer, Morris)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MICHAEL R POMPEO, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6188536) filed by AZZA ZAKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Agency, #3 Summons US Atty General, #4 Summons US Atty DC)(Fischer, Morris) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZAKI v. POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AZZA ZAKI
Represented By: Morris Eli Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?