HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: TARRANT COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, MISSOURI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, NYU WINTHROP HOSPITAL, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, PROGRESS WEST HEALTHCARE CENTER, CENTRAL VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, INC., THE WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC., SHANNON MEDICAL CENTER, NYU LANGONE HEALTH SYSTEM, FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF OUR LADY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., BARNES-JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, SOUTHWEST GENERAL HEALTH CENTER and WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC.
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01745
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 7/10/2019 (Polston, Mark)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/10/2019. (Polston, Mark)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/8/2019. (Polston, Mark)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, BARNES-JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL, CENTRAL VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF OUR LADY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MISSOURI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, NYU LANGONE HEALTH SYSTEM, NYU WINTHROP HOSPITAL, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, PROGRESS WEST HEALTHCARE CENTER, SHANNON MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTHWEST GENERAL HEALTH CENTER, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, TARRANT COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Polston, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Humphreys on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Humphreys, Bradley)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zef, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-02841-RMC, 1:19-cv-00132-RMC. (Polston, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, BARNES-JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL, CENTRAL VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF OUR LADY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MISSOURI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, NYU LANGONE HEALTH SYSTEM, NYU WINTHROP HOSPITAL, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, PROGRESS WEST HEALTHCARE CENTER, SHANNON MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTHWEST GENERAL HEALTH CENTER, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, TARRANT COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, THE WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC., UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER (Polston, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6190195) filed by HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF OUR LADY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., SHANNON MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, THE WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC., MISSOURI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., PROGRESS WEST HEALTHCARE CENTER, STANFORD HEALTH CARE, BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL, NYU LANGONE HEALTH SYSTEM, TARRANT COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, BARNES-JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL, HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NYU WINTHROP HOSPITAL, SOUTHWEST GENERAL HEALTH CENTER, CENTRAL VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #5 Summons DC U.S. Attorney, #6 Summons HHS Sec'y Azar, #7 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Polston, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARRANT COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSOURI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYU WINTHROP HOSPITAL
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSF HEALTHCARE SYSTEM
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANFORD HEALTH CARE
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROGRESS WEST HEALTHCARE CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL VERMONT MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYU LANGONE HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF OUR LADY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARNES-JEWISH WEST COUNTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEARTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARNES-JEWISH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHWEST GENERAL HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AUXILIARY, INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?