100REPORTERS et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Plaintiff: 100REPORTERS and DOUGLAS GILLISON
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01753
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Peterson, Benton)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Peterson, Benton)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in this Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/10/2019. (lcrdm1, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/24/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/24/2019 (Townsend, KatieLynn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/24/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/24/2019. (Townsend, KatieLynn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by 100REPORTERS LLC, Douglas Gillison (zef, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6192705) filed by 100REPORTERS, Douglas Gillison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Rule LCvR 26.1 Certificate, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/17/2019) (zef, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2019) (zef, ). Modified text on 6/17/2019 (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 100REPORTERS et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 100REPORTERS
Represented By: KatieLynn Boyd Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS GILLISON
Represented By: KatieLynn Boyd Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?