WESTERN VALUES PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Plaintiff: WESTERN VALUES PROJECT
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE and U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Case Number: 1:2019cv01755
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of All Defendants (Peterson, Benton)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 6/26/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 6/24/2019; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 6/24/2019 (Helle, Sean)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/25/2019. (Helle, Sean)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/26/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/26/2019. (Helle, Sean)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE.(Peterson, Benton)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zef, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (Helle, Sean)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6193592) filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #23 Summons U.S. Department of the Interior Summons, #24 Summons U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service Summons, #25 Summons U.S. Bureau of Land Management Summons)(Helle, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTERN VALUES PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTERN VALUES PROJECT
Represented By: Sean M. Helle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?