BATES COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR et al

Plaintiff: BATES COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GHS LAURENS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, VALLEY VIEW MEDICAL CENTER, VERDE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER and NOVANT HEALTH BRUNSWICK MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ROBERT G. EATON, SEEMA VERMA and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01767
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G. EATON, SEEMA VERMA.(Hair, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BATES COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GHS LAURENS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NOVANT HEALTH BRUNSWICK MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY VIEW MEDICAL CENTER, VERDE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kenneth Tobias, #2 Exhibit to Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Glazer, Joseph)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by VERDE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, BATES COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, VALLEY VIEW MEDICAL CENTER, GHS LAURENS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NOVANT HEALTH BRUNSWICK MEDICAL CENTER.(Glazer, Joseph)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #10 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' motion is GRANTED. The following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment by August 15, 2019; (2) Defendants shall file their consolidated cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiffs' motion by September 30, 2019; (3) Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated reply in support of their motion and opposition to Defendants' motion by October 15, 2019; (4) and Defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion by October 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/29/2019. (lctjk2)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G. EATON, SEEMA VERMA.(Hair, Christopher)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G. EATON, SEEMA VERMA (Hair, Christopher)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of All Defendants (Hair, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/25/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/24/2019. (Glazer, Joseph)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT G. EATON served on 6/22/2019 (Glazer, Joseph)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SEEMA VERMA served on 6/21/2019 (Glazer, Joseph)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 6/26/2019 (Glazer, Joseph)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/27/2019. (Glazer, Joseph)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G. EATON, SEEMA VERMA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
June 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BATES COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GHS LAURENS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, VALLEY VIEW MEDICAL CENTER, VERDE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER (Glazer, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT G. EATON, SEEMA VERMA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6195296) filed by VERDE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, BATES COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, VALLEY VIEW MEDICAL CENTER, GHS LAURENS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Glazer, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BATES COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT G. EATON
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEEMA VERMA
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BATES COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GHS LAURENS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY VIEW MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERDE VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVANT HEALTH BRUNSWICK MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?