NATIONAL COLLEGIATE PREPARATORY et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA CHARTER SCHOOL BOARD
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ross and NATIONAL COLLEGIATE PREPARATORY
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL BOARD
Not Yet Classified: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE PREPARATORY PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL
Case Number: 1:2019cv01785
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/30/2019. (znbn)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Unopposed #6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by August 30, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/10/2019. (lcjeb1)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL BOARD (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cumming, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Martin Cumming on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL BOARD (Cumming, Gregory)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry #3 Request for Summons to Issue was entered in error and refiled by the Clerk's Office as Docket Entry #4 . (znmw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL BOARD served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 (znmw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by NATIONAL COLLEGIATE PREPARATORY, JENNIFER ROSS.(Theresa, Aristotle) Modified on 7/2/2019 (znmw).
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL BOARD. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
June 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL BOARD with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6197182) filed by NATIONAL COLLEGIATE PREPARATORY PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL, Jennifer Ross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Theresa, Aristotle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE PREPARATORY et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA CHARTER SCHOOL BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL BOARD
Represented By: Gregory Martin Cumming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE PREPARATORY PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL
Represented By: Aristotle Charles Theresa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ross
Represented By: Aristotle Charles Theresa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE PREPARATORY
Represented By: Aristotle Charles Theresa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?