ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY v. UIP COMPANIES LLC et al
Plaintiff: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: PETER J. BONNELL, STEVEN F. SCHWAT, UIP COMPANIES LLC, STEPHEN E COX, SCHWAT REALTY LLC and MARION COSTER
Case Number: 1:2019cv01818
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY by SCHWAT REALTY LLC, PETER J. BONNELL, STEVEN F. SCHWAT, UIP COMPANIES LLC, STEPHEN E COX. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Kristin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Margulis, Andrew)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. MARION COSTER waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Margulis, Andrew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. UIP COMPANIES LLC waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Margulis, Andrew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. STEVEN F. SCHWAT waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Margulis, Andrew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. SCHWAT REALTY LLC waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Margulis, Andrew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. STEPHEN E COX waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Margulis, Andrew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. PETER J. BONNELL waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Margulis, Andrew)
June 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg)
June 21, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Case Assigned/Reassigned was entered in error due to related case. (zeg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to PETER J. BONNELL, MARION COSTER, STEPHEN E COX, STEVEN F. SCHWAT, SCHWAT REALTY LLC, UIP COMPANIES LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg). Modified on 6/21/2019 to corrected Judge Initials(zeg).
June 21, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg) Modified on 6/21/2019 (zeg).
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Margulis, Andrew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. Case related to Case No. 18-1995. (Margulis, Andrew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6204608) filed by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bonnell Summons, #3 Summons Coster Summons, #4 Summons Cox Summons, #5 Summons Schwat LLC summons, #6 Summons Schwat Summons, #7 Summons UIP Summons)(Margulis, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY v. UIP COMPANIES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER J. BONNELL
Represented By: Kristin C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN F. SCHWAT
Represented By: Kristin C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UIP COMPANIES LLC
Represented By: Kristin C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN E COX
Represented By: Kristin C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHWAT REALTY LLC
Represented By: Kristin C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Andrew L. Margulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?