ABGARA v. AT&T MOBILITY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL ABGARA
Defendant: AT&T MOBILITY, LLC, AT and EVELYN ONYENYI OKOJI
Case Number: 1:2019cv01823
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay filed by EMMANUEL ABGARA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(ztd)
July 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/9/2019. (tb)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER staying briefing on Plaintiff's #10 Motion to Amend/Correct. In his response to Defendant's Motion to Compel, the Plaintiff shall include any arguments he has in opposition to AT&T's argument (found on page 3 of its brief) that arbitration is appropriate even if the Complaint is amended. In the event Plaintiff's claims survive in this forum, he may file a motion to renew the motion to amend. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to:EMMANUEL ABGARA, 4017 5th Street NW, Washington, DC 20011. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/25/19. (DJS)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order advising plaintiff to respond to AT&T's Motion to Compel #5 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Response due by 8/9/2019. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: EMMANUEL ABGARA, 4017 5th Street NW, Washington, DC 20011. (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/24/19. (DJS)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AT&T MOBILITY, LLC (Coleman, Brian)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay, MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Stay by AT&T MOBILITY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support and Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coleman, Brian)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Arthur Coleman on behalf of AT&T MOBILITY, LLC (Coleman, Brian)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT by EMMANUEL ABGARA. (ztd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT by EMMANUEL ABGARA. (ztd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by EMMANUEL ABGARA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd); ("Leave to file granted" signed 7/16/19 by Judge Tanya Chutkan) Modified on 7/25/2019 (ztd).
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AT&T MOBILITY, LLC served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; EVELYN ONYENYI OKOJI served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019 (ztd)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court, including rules regarding service of process. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to : EMMANUEL ABGARA, 4017 5th Street NW, Washington, DC 20011. (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/27/19. (DJS) (zjth).
June 21, 2019 Summons (2) Issued as to AT&T MOBILITY, LLC, EVELYN ONYENYI OKOJI. (ztd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T MOBILITY, LLC, EVELYN ONYENYI OKOJI ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616099084) with Jury Demand filed by EMMANUEL ABGARA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABGARA v. AT&T MOBILITY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T MOBILITY, LLC
Represented By: Brian Arthur Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT
Represented By: Brian Arthur Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVELYN ONYENYI OKOJI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL ABGARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?